EP1546025 - DISPENSER FOR LIMITING MATERIAL EXTRUDED AFTER ACTUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coltene/Whaledent Inc. 235 Ascot Parkway Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44223 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Coltene/Whaledent 235 Ascot Parkway Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44223 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SULLIVAN, John, F. 3860 Deer Run Oval Richfield, OH 44286 / US | 02 /
MAYER, Stanley, E. 9 Mercer Street Middletown, NY 10940 / US | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03759609.5 | 01.10.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US30971 | Priority number, date | US20020415020P | 01.10.2002 Original published format: US 415020 P | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004031069 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1546025 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/40 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
B05C17/014 (EP,US);
A61C5/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/03] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG ZUR BEGRENZUNG VON EXTRUDIERTEM MATERIAL NACH DER BETÄTIGUNG | [2005/26] | English: | DISPENSER FOR LIMITING MATERIAL EXTRUDED AFTER ACTUATION | [2005/26] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR POUR LIMITER LA QUANTITE DE MATIERE EXTRUDEE APRES ACTIONNEMENT | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 01.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/46] | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4681524 (IKEDA SHIGERU [JP], et al); | [A]US4869403 (BRUENING WERNER [DE]); | [A]US5653363 (CHANG PETER J Y [US]); | [A]US5390831 (SCHNEIDER MARK C [US]) |