EP1546965 - NODE-LEVEL MODIFICATION DURING EXECUTION OF AN ENTERPRISE PLANNING MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Cognos Incorporated 3755 Riverside Drive P.O. Box 9707 Station T Ottawa Ontario K1G 4K9 / CA | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Adaytum, Inc. 2051 Killebrew Drive, Suite 400 Bloomington, MN 55425 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pearson, Duncan G. Hall Farm Firby, York Y060 7LH / GB | 02 /
Gould, Michael 10 Stonefield Garth Easingwold, York Y061 3NW / GB | 03 /
Bowen, David S. 47 Broadway West York, Y010 4JN / GB | 04 /
Baverstock, Dorian 3 Northcote Villas, Cobourg Road Montpelier, Bristol BS6 5HY / GB | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Ling, Christopher John, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Ling, Christopher John, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [2005/26] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03759615.2 | 30.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US30983 | Priority number, date | US20020421130P | 30.09.2002 Original published format: US 421130 P | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004032013 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1546965 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIKATION AUF KNOTENEBENE WûHREND DER AUSF HRUNG EINES UNTERNEHMENSPLANUNGSMODELLS | [2005/26] | English: | NODE-LEVEL MODIFICATION DURING EXECUTION OF AN ENTERPRISE PLANNING MODEL | [2005/26] | French: | MODIFICATION AU NIVEAU DU NOEUD PENDANT L'EXECUTION D'UN MODELE DE PLANIFICATION COMMERCIALE | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9418620 (ACTION TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 15, paragraphs 2-6 - page 16, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 17, paragraphs 1-4 - page 18, paragraphs 1-5 * * page 19, paragraphs 1-4 *; | [X]WO0211041 (ADAYTUM SOFTWARE INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3, lines 23-33 - page 4, lines 1-33 * * page 5, lines 1-28 - page 8, lines 6-15 *; | [X]WO0219224 (TOGETHERSOFT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 10, paragraphs 1,3,4 * * page 11, paragraph 1 ** page 13, paragraphs 1,2 * | International search | [X]US6397191 (NOTANI RANJIT N [US], et al) |