EP1513958 - COMPOSITIONS FOR DETECTING HEPATITIS B VIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/11] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING HEPATITIS B VIRUS | ||
[2011/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEN-PROBE INCORPORATED Patent Department 10210 Genetic Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/32] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Gen-Probe Incorporated Patent Department 10210 Genetic Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINNEN, Jeffrey, M. 13228 Cooperage Court Poway, CA 92064 / US | 02 /
KOLK, Daniel, P. 2118 Prestige Road Ramona, CA 92065 / US | 03 /
DOCKTER, Janel, M. 1713 Stewart Street Oceanside, CA 92054 / US | 04 /
GETMAN, Damon, K. 14542 Garden Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | 05 /
YOSHIMURA, Tadashi 4-29-13 Otsugaoka Shonan-machi, Chiba 277-0921 / JP | 06 /
HO-SING-LOY, Martha, K. 11303 Camarosa Circle San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 07 /
STRINGFELLOW, Leslie, A. 9301 Stargaze Avenue San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 08 /
POLLNER, Reinhold, B. 12879 Pine Meadow Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2011/31] |
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
LINNEN, Jeffrey, M. 13228 Cooperage Court Poway, CA 92064 / US | ||
02 /
KOLK, Daniel, P. 2118 Prestige Road Ramona, CA 92065 / US | |||
03 /
DOCKTER, Janel, M. 1713 Stewart Street Oceanside, CA 92054 / US | |||
04 /
GETMAN, Damon, K. 14542 Garden Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | |||
05 /
YOSHIMURA, Tadashi 4-29-13 Otsuagoka Shonan-machi, Chiba 277-0921 / JP | |||
06 /
HO-SING-LOY, Martha, K. 11303 Camarosa Circle San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
07 /
STRINGFELLOW, Leslie, A. 9301 Stargaze Avenue San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
08 /
POLLNER, Reinhold, B. 12879 Pine Meadow Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
Former [2005/11] | 01 /
LINNEN, Jeffrey, M. 13228 Cooperage Court Poway, CA 92064 / US | ||
02 /
KOLK, Daniel, P. 2118 Prestige Road Ramona, CA 92065 / US | |||
03 /
DOCKTER, Janel, M. 1713 Stewart Street Oceanside, CA 92054 / US | |||
04 /
GETMAN, Damon, K. 14542 Garden Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | |||
05 /
YOSHIMURA, Tadashi 14-29-13 Otsugaoka Shonan-machi, Chiba 277-0921 / JP | |||
06 /
HO-SING-LOY, Martha K. 11303 Camarosa Circle San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
07 /
STRINGFELLOW, Leslie, A. 9301 Stargaze Avenue San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
08 /
POLLNER, Reinhold B. 12879 Pine Meadow Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03760408.9 | 13.06.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003US18993 | Priority number, date | US20020389393P | 14.06.2002 Original published format: US 389393 P | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03106714 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513958 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513958 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/04 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
C12Q1/706 (EP,US);
C12Q1/703 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM NACHWEIS VON HEPATITIS-B-VIRUS | [2011/04] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR DETECTING HEPATITIS B VIRUS | [2011/04] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE DETECTION DU VIRUS DE L'HEPATITE B | [2011/04] |
Former [2005/11] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON HEPATITIS-B-VIRUS | ||
Former [2005/11] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING HEPATITIS B VIRUS | ||
Former [2005/11] | COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES DE DETECTION DU VIRUS DE L'HEPATITE B | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10176396.9 / EP2292801 | EP18187823.2 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Request for further processing for: | 08.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2003 | AT | 10.08.2011 | BE | 10.08.2011 | CY | 10.08.2011 | CZ | 10.08.2011 | DK | 10.08.2011 | EE | 10.08.2011 | FI | 10.08.2011 | RO | 10.08.2011 | SE | 10.08.2011 | SI | 10.08.2011 | SK | 10.08.2011 | TR | 10.08.2011 | BG | 10.11.2011 | GR | 11.11.2011 | PT | 12.12.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
TR | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 10.08.2011 | |
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 10.08.2011 | |
PT | 12.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0309230 (ML TECHNOLOGY VENTURES [US]) [Y] 16-19,36,37 * relevant to inventions 5, 6, 10 *; | [Y]WO8904375 (SISKA DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [Y] 16-22,36-39 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0357011 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [Y] 8-52 * the whole document *; | [XAY]EP0408295 (GEN PROBE INC [US]) [X] 27-37,40-45,47-49 * relevant to inventions 3-12 * [A] 1-7 [Y] 8-26,38,39,46,50-52; | [XY]WO9110746 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * relevant to inventions 2, 4, 6, 8-12 * [Y] 8-52; | [XY]WO9313120 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [Y] 8-52; | [XAY]EP0569237 (GEN PROBE INC [US]) [X] 27-37,40-45,47-49 * the whole document * [A] 1-7 [Y] 8-26,38,39,46,50-52; | [Y]EP0590327 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 8-52 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9502690 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [Y] 8-52; | [Y]WO9513399 (NEW YORK HEALTH RES INST [US]) [Y] 20-22,38,39 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9621043 (SYMBIOTECH INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 8-26; | [XY]WO9640996 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1-25,27-37,40-45,47-49 * the whole document * [Y] 26,38,39,46,50-52; | [Y]WO9937805 (CYTOCELL LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 8-52 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0971039 (ENZO DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [X] 27-37,40-45,47-49 * the whole document * [Y] 8-26,38,39,46,50-52; | [Y]DE19832050 (BIOTEST PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8-52 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0075371 (TOSOH CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 50-52* the whole document *; | [Y]WO0107661 (GEN PROBE INC [US], et al) [Y] 8-19,23-37,40-49 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0136442 (JI JIUPING [US], et al) [X] 1-19,23-25,27-37,40-45,47-52 * the whole document * [Y] 20-22,26,38,39,46; | [Y]EP1103624 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [Y] 50-52 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0164959 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-25,27-45,47-49 * the whole document * [Y] 26,46,50-52; | [XY]WO0177317 (EIKEN CHEMICAL [JP], et al) [X] 27-37,40-45,47-49 * the whole document * [Y] 8-26,38,39,46,50-52; | [PXY]EP1275715 (EIKEN CHEMICAL [JP]) [PX] 27-37,40-45,47-49 * relevant to inventions 3-12 * [PY] 8-26,38,39,46,50-52; | [PXY]WO03031934 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document * [PY] 8-22; | [E]WO03050308 (AARON DIAMOND AIDS RES CT [US], et al) [E] 8-49 * the whole document *; | [E]WO03093797 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [E] 20-22,38,39 * the whole document *; | [XY] - MENG Q ET AL, "Automated multiplex assay system for simultaneous detection of hepatitis B virus DNA, hepatitis C virus RNA, and human immunodeficiency virus type 1 RNA", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (200108), vol. 39, no. 8, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 2937 - 2945, XP002193784 [X] 1-25,27-37,40-45,47-52 * the whole document * [Y] 26,38,39,46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.39.8.2937-2945.2001 | [Y] - STRINGFELLOW L ET AL, "Early detection of HBV using the Transcription-Mediated Amplification/Dual Kinetic Assay system", TRANSFUSION (BETHESDA), & 52ND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF BLOOD BANKS; SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, USA; NOVEMBER 6-10, 1999, (199910), vol. 39, no. 10 SUPPL., ISSN 0041-1132, page 68S, XP009064337 [Y] 8-37 * the whole document * | [Y] - NELSON N C ET AL, "SIMULTANEOUS DETECTION OF MULTIPLE NUCLEIC ACID TARGETS IN A HOMOGENEOUS FORMAT", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, US, (1996), vol. 35, no. 25, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 8429 - 8438, XP000602418 [Y] 16-19,36,37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi960085+ | [Y] - LEONE ET AL, "MOLECULAR BEACON PROBES COMBINED WITH AMPLIFICATION BY NASBA ENABLE HOMOGENEOUS, REAL-TIME DETECTION OF RNA", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1998), vol. 26, no. 9, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 2150 - 2155, XP002134179 [Y] 20-22,38,39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/26.9.2150 | [Y] - DEFOORT J-P ET AL, "Simultaneous detection of multiplex-amplified human immunodeficiency virus type 1 RNA, hepatitis C virus RNA, and hepatitis B virus DNA using a flow cytometer microsphere-based hybridization assay", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (200003), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 1066 - 1071, XP002229226 [Y] 8-52 * the whole document * | [Y] - MCDONOUGH S H ET AL, "HIGH THROUGHPUT ASSAY FOR THE SIMULTANEOUS OR SEPARATE DETECTION OFHUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) AND HEPATITIS TYPE C VIRUS (HCV)", INFUSIONSTHERAPIE UND TRANSFUSIONSMEDIZIN, BASEL, CH, (1998), vol. 25, no. 2/3, ISSN 1019-8466, pages 164 - 169, XP001004813 [Y] 50-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000053415 | [Y] - HILL C S, "MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTIC TESTING FOR INFECTIOUS DISEASES USING TMA TECHNOLOGY", EXPERT REVIEW OF MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS, FUTURE DRUGS, LONDON, GB, (200111), vol. 1, no. 4, ISSN 1473-7159, pages 445 - 455, XP001205766 [Y] 50-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/14737159.1.4.445 | [PY] - LINNEN J M ET AL, "Sensitivity and specificity of a TMA-based Triplex Assay for simultaneous screening of HIV-1, HCV and HBV in blood donations.", VOX SANGUINIS, & 27TH CONGRESS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF BLOOD TRANSFUSION HELD IN CONJUNCTION WITH CANADIAN SO; VANCOUVER, BRITISH COLOMBIA, CANADA; AUGUST 24-29, 2002, (200208), vol. 83, no. Supplement 2, ISSN 0042-9007, page 183, XP009064314 [PY] 50-52 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5629153 (URDEA MICHAEL S [US]); | [Y]US5736334 (SPIES UWE [DE]); | [Y]WO0104361 (GEN PROBE INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO0140279 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE], et al) | by applicant | WO9313121 | US5585481 | US5639604 | US5656207 | US5658737 | US5925517 | - The Biochemistry of the Nucleic Acids, (1992), pages 5 - 36 |