EP1526839 - ORAL PHARMACEUTICAL FORMS OF LIQUID DRUGS HAVING IMPROVED BIOAVAILABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicox S.A. Taissounières HB4 1681 route des Dolines, BP 313 06560 Sophia Antipolis - Valbonne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states NicOx S.A. Taissounières HB4 1681 route des Dolines, BP 313 06560 Sophia Antipolis - Valbonne / FR | ||
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Nicox S.A. 2455, routes des Dolines, Espace Gaia II - Bâtiment I 06906 Sophia Antipolis Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEL SOLDATO, Piero Via E. Toti 22 I-20052 Monza / IT | 02 /
SANTUS, Giancarlo Via Zuara, 8 I-20146 Milano / IT | 03 /
MACELLONI, Cristina Via Dante, 9 I-20030 Bovisio Masciago / IT | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Barchielli, Giovanna Nicox Research Institute S.r.l. Patent Department Via Ariosto, 21 20091 Bresso (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | Barchielli, Giovanna Nicox Research Institute S.r.l., Patent Department, Via Ariosto, 21 20091 Bresso (Milano) / IT | Application number, filing date | 03760660.5 | 20.06.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003EP06496 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI01392 | 25.06.2002 Original published format: IT MI20021392 | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004000273 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1526839 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1526839 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/107, A61K31/216, A61K31/235, A61K31/407, A61K31/426, A61K31/44, A61K31/4164, A61K31/4709 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
A61K9/145 (EP,US);
A61K47/06 (KR);
A61K31/216 (EP,US);
A61K31/235 (EP,US);
A61K31/407 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/216, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/235, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/407, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4164, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/426, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORALE, PHARMAZEUTISCHE DARREICHUNGSFORMEN VON FLÜSSIGEN MEDIKAMENTEN MITVERBESSERTER BIOVERFÜGBARKEIT | [2005/18] | English: | ORAL PHARMACEUTICAL FORMS OF LIQUID DRUGS HAVING IMPROVED BIOAVAILABILITY | [2005/18] | French: | FORMES PHARMACEUTIQUES ORALES DE MEDICAMENTS LIQUIDES A BIODISPONIBILITE AMELIOREE | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 07.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0061537 (NICOX SA [FR], et al) [AD] 1,5,6* example 6 *; | [AD]WO0166087 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1,2,5,6,8-10,18 * example -; claim - *; | [AD]WO0166088 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1,2,5,6,8-10,18 * examples 1-15, 18-20; claims 1-5, 12-37 * |