EP1535680 - COATED CUTTING TOOL MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/13] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Kobe Tools Corporation 179-1, Nishioike, Kanagasaki, Uozumicho Akashi-shi, Hyogo 674-0071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAOKA, Hidemitsu c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp. Central Rsrch. Inst. Naka Research Center 1002-14, Mukaiyama, Naka-cho Naka-gun, Ibaraki-Ken / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Eiji c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp. Central Rsrch. Inst. Naka Research Center 1002-14, Mukaiyama, Naka-cho Naka-gun, Ibaraki-Ken / JP | [2015/32] |
Former [2006/03] | 01 /
TAKAOKA, Hidemitsu.Mitsubishi Materials Corp Central Rsrch. Inst., 1002-14, Mukaiyama Naka-cho, Naka-gu / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMURA, Eiji Mitsubishi Materials Corp. Central Rsrch. Inst., 1002-14, Mukaiyama Naka-cho, Naka--gun / JP | |||
Former [2005/42] | 01 /
TAKAOKA, Hidemitsu.Mitsubishi Materials Corp Central Rsrch. Inst., 1002-14, Mukaiyama Naka-cho, Naka-gu / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMURA, Eij Mitsubishi Materials Corp. Central Rsrch. Inst., 1002-14, Mukaiyama Naka-cho, Naka--gun / JP | |||
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
TAKAOKA, Hidemitsu.itsubishi Mat Corp Central Rsrch. Inst., 1002-14, Mukaiyama Naka-cho, Naka-gu / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMURA, eiji, Mitsubishi Materials Corp. Central Rsrch. Inst., 1002-14, Mukaiyama Naka-cho, Naka--gun / JP | |||
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
TAKAOKA, H., Mitsubishi Materials Corp. Central Rsrch. Inst., 1002-14, Mukaiyama Naka-cho, Naka-gu / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMURA, eiji, Mitsubishi Materials Corp. Central Rsrch. Inst., 1002-14, Mukaiyama Naka-cho, Naka--gun / JP | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/22] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03760920.3 | 20.06.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003JP07866 | Priority number, date | JP20020183768 | 25.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002183768 | JP20020183772 | 25.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002183772 | [2005/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004000494 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535680 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535680 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C30/00, C23C14/06 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
C23C14/0641 (EP,US);
C23C14/0664 (EP,US);
C23C30/005 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/22] | B23B27/14, C23C14/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETES SCHNEIDWERKZEUGGLIED | [2005/22] | English: | COATED CUTTING TOOL MEMBER | [2005/22] | French: | ELEMENT POUR OUTIL DE COUPE REVETU | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2004 | Translation filed | 23.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10177895.9 / EP2255908 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2003 | AT | 05.08.2015 | BE | 05.08.2015 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | IT | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.06.2003 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.06.2003 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
GR | 06.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6033768 (MUENZ WOLF-DIETER [GB], et al) [A] 8-11 * claims 19-26 *; | [XY]JP2000334606 (HITACHI TOOL ENG) [X] 2,5-7 * abstract * [Y] 3,4; | [XY]JP2000334607 (HITACHI TOOL ENG) [X] 2,5-7 * abstract * [Y] 3,4; | [L]JP2004009162 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP, et al) [L] 1,5-11* the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH09323205 (HITACHI TOOL); | [Y]JPH0797679 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH11216601 (OSG CORP); | [X]JP2000334606 (HITACHI TOOL ENG); | [X]JP2000334607 (HITACHI TOOL ENG); | [Y]JP2001348661 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [A]JPH07205362 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JPH0797679 | JPH09323205 |