EP1516425 - BRUSHLESS MOTOR CONTROL UTILIZING INDEPENDENT PHASE PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA MANUFACTURING & SERVICES SAS 4, rue de Presbourg 75116 Paris / FR | [2006/48] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Wavecrest Laboratories, LLC 45600 Terminal Drive Dulles, VA 20166 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASLOV, Boris, A. 10814 Oldfield Drive Reston, VA 20191 / US | 02 /
FEEMSTER, Matthew, G. 219 St. Ives Drive Severna Park, MD 21146 / US | 03 /
SOGHOMONIAN, Zareh, Salmasi 22340 Great Trail Terrace Sterling, VA 20164 / US | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2006/41] | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/12] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03761013.6 | 28.03.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003US08675 | Priority number, date | US20020173610 | 19.06.2002 Original published format: US 173610 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004001953 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516425 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1516425 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02P21/14, H02P6/08 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
H02P25/08 (EP,US);
H02P23/0004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/12] | H02P21/00, H02P7/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGELUNG EINES BÜRSTENLOSEN MOTORS UNTER VERWENDUNG UNABHÄNGIGER PHASENPARAMETER | [2005/12] | English: | BRUSHLESS MOTOR CONTROL UTILIZING INDEPENDENT PHASE PARAMETERS | [2005/12] | French: | COMMANDE DE MOTEUR SANS BALAI UTILISANT DES PARAMETRES DE PHASE INDEPENDANTS | [2005/12] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 25.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 18.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.12.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.04.2007 | CY | 25.04.2007 | CZ | 25.04.2007 | DK | 25.04.2007 | EE | 25.04.2007 | FI | 25.04.2007 | RO | 25.04.2007 | SI | 25.04.2007 | SK | 25.04.2007 | TR | 25.04.2007 | BG | 25.07.2007 | SE | 25.07.2007 | GR | 26.07.2007 | PT | 25.09.2007 | HU | 26.10.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
CY | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
EE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
HU | 26.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
CY | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
EE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
EE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 25.04.2007 | |
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5365137 (RICHARDSON LYMAN [CA], et al); | [XY]DE19503492 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [YA]US6373211 (HENRY RASSEM RAGHEB [US], et al); |