EP1513457 - Endoscopic fundoplication devices for treatment of gastroesophageal reflux disease [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/11] | ENDOSCOPIC FUNDOPLICATION DEVICES FOR TREATMENT OF GASTROESOPHAGEAL REFLUX DISEASE | ||
[2007/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited Seaston House P.O. Box 1317 Hastings Christ Church, West Indies / BB | [2007/07] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited Financial Services Centre Bishop's Court Hill Saint Michael Barbados / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIGORYANTS, Sergey, S. 86 Fremont Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 02 /
VU, Liem, T. 97 Wayne Road Needham, MA 02494 / US | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Molnia, David Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03761072.2 | 17.06.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003US18935 | Priority number, date | US20020175307 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: US 175307 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004000129 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1513457 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513457 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B17/0487 (EP,US);
A61B17/062 (EP,US);
A61B17/1285 (US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00827 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0404 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0417 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0419 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0462 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Endoskopisches Fundoplication-Gerät zur Behandlung von Gastroösophagealen Reflux | [2007/10] | English: | Endoscopic fundoplication devices for treatment of gastroesophageal reflux disease | [2007/10] | French: | Dispositifs de fundoplication endoscopiques permettant de traiter le reflux gastro-oesphagien pathologique | [2007/10] |
Former [2005/11] | ENDOSKOPISCHES FUNDOPLICATION-GERÄT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GASTROÖSOPHAGEALEN REFLUX | ||
Former [2005/11] | ENDOSCOPIC FUNDOPLICATION DEVICES FOR TREATMENT OF GASTROESOPHAGEAL REFLUX DISEASE | ||
Former [2005/11] | DISPOSITIFS DE FUNDOPLICATION ENDOSCOPIQUES ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LE REFLUX GASTRO-OESOPHAGIEN PATHOLOGIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 22.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07113565.1 / EP1844716 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2007 | BE | 01.08.2007 | CH | 01.08.2007 | CY | 01.08.2007 | CZ | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | EE | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | LI | 01.08.2007 | RO | 01.08.2007 | SI | 01.08.2007 | SK | 01.08.2007 | TR | 01.08.2007 | BG | 01.11.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | ES | 12.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | HU | 02.02.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
HU | 02.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BG | 01.11.2007 | |
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 12.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5330503 (YOON INBAE [US]) [A] 29-46* column 6, lines 1-65; figures 1A-E *; | [X]DE4302895 (WIESSNER SERAG GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 29-39,42-46 * the whole document *; | [X]US5527322 (KLEIN ENRIQUE J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,11,12,18,22 * column 5, line 34 - column 9, line 40; figures 1-6C *; | [XA]DE4447658 (KARLSRUHE FORSCHZENT [DE]) [X] 29-34 * abstract * [A] 1,22,39; | [A]US5607389 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [A] 1-15,18,22-28 * column A; figures 1-15 *; | [XA]US5713908 (JAMEEL IRFAN MUFTY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13,18,22 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 36; figures 1,2,5-9 * [A] 26-28; | [A]US5843121 (YOON INBAE [US]) [A] 22,23,26-28 * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 26; figures 24-39 * * column A *; | [A]WO9948429 (COOK UROLOGICAL INC [US]) [A] 24,25 * abstract *; | [XA]US2001039426 (MAKOWER JOSHUA [US], et al) [X] 29,31,32,39-42 * page 6, paragraph 58 - paragraph 65; figures 7-11,23-23B * * page 9, paragraph 79 - page 12, paragraph 99; figures 23A-26 * [A] 1,22; | [A]WO0224080 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15,18,22-28 * page 11, paragraph 56 - page 19, paragraph 75; figures 2A-7 * * page 33, paragraph 109 - page 34, paragraph 112; figures 15A-C * |