EP1412199 - DEVICE INTEGRATED INTO A CARD IN ORDER TO ACTIVATE AND/OR DEACTIVATE A LIGHT, SOUND OR LIGHT AND SOUND MODULE BY MEANS OF BLOWING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helou, Nicolas 35, rue du Docteur Blanche 75016 Paris / FR | [2004/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/20] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/37] | Breese, Pierre NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/18] | Breese, Pierre 3, avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03761371.8 | 23.06.2003 | [2004/18] | WO2003FR01915 | Priority number, date | FR20020011570 | 18.09.2002 Original published format: FR 0211570 | [2004/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004011275 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1412199 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1412199 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/02 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
B42D15/022 (EP,US);
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
F21V23/0442 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/18] | Title | German: | IN EINE KARTE INTEGRIERTE VORRICHTUNG ZUM AKTIVIEREN UND/ODER DEAKTIVIEREN EINES LICHT-, SCHALL- ODER LICHT- UND SCHALL-MODULS DURCH BLASEN | [2004/18] | English: | DEVICE INTEGRATED INTO A CARD IN ORDER TO ACTIVATE AND/OR DEACTIVATE A LIGHT, SOUND OR LIGHT AND SOUND MODULE BY MEANS OF BLOWING | [2004/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF INTEGRE DANS UNE CARTE POUR ACTIVER ET/OU DESACTIVER PAR LE SOUFFLE UN MODULE LUMINEUX OU SONORE OU LA COMBINAISON DES DEUX | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 04.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2003 | AT | 17.10.2012 | CY | 17.10.2012 | CZ | 17.10.2012 | DK | 17.10.2012 | EE | 17.10.2012 | FI | 17.10.2012 | MC | 17.10.2012 | RO | 17.10.2012 | SE | 17.10.2012 | SI | 17.10.2012 | SK | 17.10.2012 | TR | 17.10.2012 | BG | 17.01.2013 | GR | 18.01.2013 | ES | 28.01.2013 | PT | 18.02.2013 | IE | 23.06.2013 | LU | 23.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
TR | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 23.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 23.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 17.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0070653 (COMMODORE ELECTRONICS LTD [BS]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 31 - page 5, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5671555 (FERNANDES GARY L [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5761836 (DAWSON MICHAEL [IE]) [A] 1* column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 58; figures 1,2 * |