EP1525261 - IMPACT-RESISTANT POLYOLEFIN COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Soperga 14/A 20127 Milano / IT | [2011/35] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.P.A. Via Pergolesi, 25 20124 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLICONI, Anteo Via Volta, 22 45030 Santa Maria Maddalena, Rovigo / IT | 02 /
ANGELINI, Antonella Via Val Trebba, 16 44100 Ferrara / IT | 03 /
SGARZI, Paola Via Borgo dei Leoni, 83 44100 Ferrara / IT | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le G. Donegani 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P. le Privato G. Donegani, 12 Casella Postale 19 44100 Ferrara / IT | ||
Former [2005/32] | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property P. le G. Donegani, 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | ||
Former [2005/17] | Fisauli, Beatrice A. M. (IT) Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property, Via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03761456.7 | 11.06.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003EP06097 | Priority number, date | EP20020014214 | 26.06.2002 Original published format: EP 02014214 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004003073 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525261 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525261 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/10, B29C45/00, // C08L23:10, C08L23:08 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
C08L23/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/08 (KR);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L2308/00 (EP,US);
C08L2314/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/10, C08L2666/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/17] | C08L23/10, B29C45/00, // C08L23:10, C08L23:08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Title | German: | SCHLAGFESTE POLYOLEFINZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2005/17] | English: | IMPACT-RESISTANT POLYOLEFIN COMPOSITIONS | [2005/17] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POLYOLEFINIQUES RESISTANT AUX CHOCS | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 15.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   06.07.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2003 | AT | 11.07.2012 | BE | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | MC | 11.07.2012 | NL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | ES | 22.10.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US4734459 (CECCHIN GIULIANO [IT], et al) [YD] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 46; tables I-II *; | [XY]US5541260 (PELLICONI ANTEO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 40; example -; tables 2-4 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]EP0936248 (GRAND POLYMER CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 19 * * page 2, line 50 - line 55 * * example -; tables 1-8 * * page 8, line 24 - line 41 *; | [AD]WO0119915 (BASELLTECH USA INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * abstract ** column 1, line 9 - column 3, line 52; example -; tables 1,2 * |