EP1515870 - DEVICE FOR SECURING A LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/12] | DEVICE FOR SECURING A LOAD AND TRACKBOUND VEHICLE | ||
[2008/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harders, Walter Weimarer Strasse 1 28205 Bremen / DE | For all designated states Stern, Reinald Val-de-Reuil-Strasse 3 27721 Ritterhude / DE | For all designated states Lemke, Wilfried Natt 12 41334 Nettetal / DE | [2005/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Möller, Friedrich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Möller, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03761468.2 | 16.06.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003EP06335 | Priority number, date | DE2002128434 | 26.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10228434 | [2005/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004002778 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1515870 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1515870 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/08 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B60P7/0807 (EP);
B61D45/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHERUNG VON LADUNG | [2008/19] | English: | DEVICE FOR SECURING A LOAD | [2008/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR IMMOBILISER UNE CHARGE | [2008/19] |
Former [2005/12] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHERUNG VON LADUNG UND SPURGEBUNDENES FAHRZEUG | ||
Former [2005/12] | DEVICE FOR SECURING A LOAD AND TRACKBOUND VEHICLE | ||
Former [2005/12] | DISPOSITIF POUR IMMOBILISER UNE CHARGE ET VEHICULE GUIDE | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 17.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.09.2008 | CZ | 10.09.2008 | DK | 10.09.2008 | EE | 10.09.2008 | FI | 10.09.2008 | IE | 10.09.2008 | IT | 10.09.2008 | NL | 10.09.2008 | RO | 10.09.2008 | SI | 10.09.2008 | SK | 10.09.2008 | TR | 10.09.2008 | BG | 10.12.2008 | SE | 10.12.2008 | GR | 11.12.2008 | ES | 21.12.2008 | PT | 10.02.2009 | HU | 11.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
HU | 11.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | FI | 10.09.2008 | |
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | FI | 10.09.2008 | |
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 10.09.2008 | |
SI | 10.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1162112 (SORTIMO SPEEDWAVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] * * figure 1 *; | [PX]EP1254809 (RAYMOND A & CIE [FR]) [PX] 1 * abstract * * figure 5 *; | [E]US6641342 (GIRARDIN JEAN MARC [US]) [E] 1,2 * column 2, lines 26-60 ** figure 4 * |