EP1522030 - CONTEXT SEARCHABLE COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
NL
LI
International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | For:MC
Compagnie IBM France Tour Descartes La Défense 5 2 Avenue Gambetta 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
NL
LI
International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
For:MC
Compagnie IBM France Tour Descartes, La Défense 5, 2, avenue Gambetta 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Michael, W. 529 River Down Road Georgetown, TX 78628 / US | 02 /
PAOLINI, Michael, A. 6407 Wallace Cove Austin, TX 78750 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Newton, James 11002 Bitteroot Circle Austin, TX 78726 / US | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Lopez, Frédérique, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle Le Plan du Bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | [2007/14] |
Former [2005/15] | de Pena, Alain IBM France Intellectual Property Dept. Le Plan du bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 03761578.8 | 13.06.2003 | [2005/15] | WO2003EP07136 | Priority number, date | US20020185296 | 27.06.2002 Original published format: US 185296 | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004004271 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1522030 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IM ZUSAMMENHANG SUCHBARE BOTSCHAFTEN | [2005/15] | English: | CONTEXT SEARCHABLE COMMUNICATIONS | [2005/15] | French: | COMMUNICATIONS CONSULTABLES PAR UN CONTEXTE | [2005/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 18.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002117027 ; | [A]US5526443 (NAKAYAMA TAKEHIRO [US]) [A] 1-3,5,12-14,16,23-25,27,33-36,38 * the whole document *; | [A]US5781879 (ARNOLD DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,12,13,23,24,33,34,38 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - column 2, line 62 ** claims 1,16,31 *; | [Y]WO0155903 (TRINI CASTELLI CLINO [IT]) [Y] 1-38 * abstract * * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 8 * * page 4, line 21 - page 4, line 28 * * claims 1,2,11,12 *; | [A]US6332143 (CHASE WAYNE O [CA]) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 59 * * column 6, line 33 - column 6, line 60 * * column 11, line 45 - column 11, line 53 * * claims 1-4,19-23,37-40 * * figures 3,5-8 *; | [A]WO0241191 (JUSTSYSTEM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * page 2, line 25 - page 4, line 8 * * page 6, line 3 - page 6, line 6 * * page 8, line 3 - page 8, line 7 * * claims 1,25,27 *; | [Y]WO0244991 (DIGITAL AGENT INC [KR], et al) [Y] 1-38 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - page 7, line 3 * * page 16, line 10 - page 18, line 6 * * claims 3-10 * * figures 5a-j * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020805), vol. 2002, no. 08, & JP2002117027 A 20020419 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP |