EP1532977 - ANTIFUNGAL AGENTS FOR EXTERNAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sato Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 5-27, Moto-akasaka, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0051 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Sato Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 5-27, Moto-akasaka, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0051 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDUKA, Seiji 8-5, Higashioi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | 02 /
TADA, Tomohiro 8-5, Higashioi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | 03 /
KATAYAMA, Masahide 8-5, Higashioi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | 04 /
YANAGIHARA, Satoshi 8-5, Higashioi 6-chome Shinagawa-KU, Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | 05 /
SHIMIZU, Toshihito 8-5, Higashioi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | [2010/02] |
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
ISHIDUKA, S.; c/o R & D Center SATO PHARMA. CO LTD 8-5, Higashioi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
TADA, T.; c/o R & D Center SATO PHARMA. CO LTD 8-5, Higashioi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | |||
03 /
KATAYAMA, M.; c/o R & D Center SATO PHARMA. CO LTD 8-5, Higashioi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | |||
04 /
YANAGIHARA, S.; c/o R & D Center SATO PHARMA. CO 8-5, Higashioi 6-chome Shinagawa-KU, Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | |||
05 /
SHIMIZU, T.; c/o R & D Center SATO PHARMA. CO LTD 8-5, Higashioi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | Representative(s) | Ziebig, Marlene, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 DE-10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Ziebig, Marlene, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 03761830.3 | 27.06.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003JP08221 | Priority number, date | JP20020190041 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002190041 | [2005/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004002464 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1532977 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/137, A61K31/5375, A61P31/10 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/5375 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61P31/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/5375, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIMYKOTISCHE MITTEL ZUR EXTERNEN ANWENDUNG | [2005/21] | English: | ANTIFUNGAL AGENTS FOR EXTERNAL USE | [2005/21] | French: | AGENTS ANTIFONGIQUES A USAGE EXTERNE | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2004 | Translation filed | 28.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0166145 (AVENTIS PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [X] 3,4* example 1; claim - * | International search | [Y]JPH0820527 (TOKO YAKUHIN KOGYO KK) | [Y] - BARAN R. ET AL., "A randomized trial of amorolfine 5% solution nail lacquer combined with oral terbinafne compared with terbinafine alone in the treatment of dermatophytic toenail onychomycoses affecting the matrix region", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, (2000), vol. 142, no. 6, pages 1177 - 1183, XP002971168 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2133.2000.03545.x | Examination | EP0715856 | WO9949835 | by applicant | - HIDEYO YAMAGUCHI ET AL., JAP. J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1991), vol. 44, no. 9, page 1007 | - Iryo-yaku Nihon Iyakuhin-syu, YAKUGYO JIHO-SHA, (1997), page 92 | - TETSUYA MAEDA ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1991), vol. 111, pages 126 - 137 | - MAMORU YOKOO ET AL., NISHI-NIHON HIFU-KA, (1991), vol. 53, pages 144 - 151 | - hyoyaku Nihon Iyakuhin-syu, YAKUGYO JIHO-SHA, (199710), page 1262 |