EP1539211 - METHOD OF UP-REGULATING TUMOR ANTIGEN EXPRESSION USING THYMALFASIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sciclone Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 901 Mariner's Island Boulevard San Mateo, CA 94404-1593 / US | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASI, Guido Lungotevere Flaminio, 78 I-00196 Rome / IT | 02 /
GARACI, Enrico; Via Salaria, 237 I-00199; / IT | 03 /
SINIBALDI-VALLEBONA, Paola; Via Cortina D'Ampezzo, 241 I-00135 Rome; / IT | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Nicolai, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2&3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | von Füner, Nicolai, Dr., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2&3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03762310.5 | 30.06.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US20829 | Priority number, date | US20020391969P | 28.06.2002 Original published format: US 391969 P | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004003174 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1539211 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61P35/00, A61K38/22 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K38/2292 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/24] | A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UP-REGULIERUNG DER TUMOR-ANTIGEN-EXPRESSION MIT THYMALFASIN | [2005/24] | English: | METHOD OF UP-REGULATING TUMOR ANTIGEN EXPRESSION USING THYMALFASIN | [2005/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE REGULATION EN AMONT DE L'EXPRESSION D'ANTIGENES TUMORAUX AU MOYEN DE THYMALFASINE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 25.09.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - GIULIANI C ET AL, "Thymosin -alpha1 regulates MHC class I expression in FRTL-5 cells at transcriptional level.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2000 MAR) VOL. 30, NO. 3, PP. 778-86. JOURNAL CODE: 1273201. ISSN: 0014-2980., (200003), XP008077779 [AD] 1-11 * page 778, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 783, column R, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4141(200003)30:3<778::AID-IMMU778>3.0.CO;2-I | International search | [A]US4517119 (FELIX ARTHUR M [US], et al); | [A]US4910296 (BIRR CHRISTIAN [DE], et al); | [A]US5273963 (MOODY TERRY W [US]) |