EP1535349 - APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND RELATED METHODS FOR PROCESSING, DISPENSING AND/OR EVALUATING NON-PHARMACEUTICAL DRY POWDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oriel Therapeutics, Inc. 630 Davis Drive, Suite 120 Durham, NC 27713 / US | [2005/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROWDER, Timothy, M. 4208 Thetford Road Durham, NC 27707 / US | 02 /
HICKEY, Anthony, J. 1208 Killington Court Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | 03 /
BOEKESTEIN, Vanessa 21629 Spyglass Way 904A Lexington Park, MD 20653 / US | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Gibbs, Richard, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2005/22] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 03762332.9 | 26.06.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003US20976 | Priority number, date | US20020392671P | 27.06.2002 Original published format: US 392671 P | US20030440513P | 16.01.2003 Original published format: US 440513 P | US20030434009 | 08.05.2003 Original published format: US 434009 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004002395 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1535349 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535349 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, B65B37/04, B65G53/66, B65D88/66 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
B65D88/66 (EP,US);
A61M15/0003 (EP,US);
A61M15/0005 (EP,US);
A61M15/001 (EP,US);
A61M15/0045 (EP,US);
A61M15/0048 (EP,US);
A61M15/0055 (EP,US);
A61M15/0065 (EP,US);
A61M15/0068 (EP,US);
A61M15/0075 (EP,US);
B65B37/04 (EP,US);
B65G53/66 (EP,US);
A61M15/0051 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US);
A61M2205/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/22] | H01L41/04, B01F11/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Title | German: | GERÄTE, SYSTEME UND RELEVANTE VERFAHREN FÜR DIE AUFBEREITUNG, AUSGABE UND/ODER BEURTEILUNG VON NICHTPHARMAZEUTISCHEN TROCKENPULVERN | [2005/22] | English: | APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND RELATED METHODS FOR PROCESSING, DISPENSING AND/OR EVALUATING NON-PHARMACEUTICAL DRY POWDERS | [2005/22] | French: | APPAREIL, SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES DE TRAITEMENT, DE DISTRIBUTION ET/OU D'EVALUATION DE POUDRES SECHES NON PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2003 | BE | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | ES | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | IT | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | LU | 26.06.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1907444 (MASSEN ROBERT) [X] 51 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1401446 (CARVER INC FRED S) [A] 1,25 * page 3, column L, line 50 - page 6, column R, line 126; figures 1-8 *; | [X]EP0282958 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM [DE], et al) [X] 51 * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 8; figures 1-3; claim 3 *; | [X]US4836417 (UCHIYAMA FUTOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 47,48,51 * column 2, line 53 - column 6, line 11; figure - *; | [A]DE4328750 (WAGNER INT [CH]) [A] 52,58 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH11208891 (SATASU KK) [X] 1-3,8-11,15,16,19,25,40,41,45,47,48,51 * abstract *; | [X]US5938075 (MURAI KATSUMI [JP], et al) [X] 51 * column 6, line 33 - column 8, line 57; figures 1-6 *; | [A]JP2001215146 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 52* abstract * | International search | [X]US4472091 (CALLAHAN JOHN W [US]); | [X]US5618177 (ABBOTT JOHN D [US]); | [A]US6208065 (UEYAMA MASAYUKI [JP]) | by applicant | US6226962 | US6357490 | US5865012 | US6267155 | US5727607 | JPH11208891 |