EP1518085 - LOCKED MACHINE GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heckler & Koch GmbH Beffendorfer Strasse 1 78727 Oberndorf/Neckar / DE | [2005/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÖSSNER, Ernst Asternstrasse 4 72172 Sulz-Holzhausen / DE | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03762481.4 | 05.06.2003 | [2005/13] | WO2003EP05927 | Priority number, date | DE2002129846 | 03.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10229846 | [2005/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004005835 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1518085 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518085 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F41A3/26, F41A21/48 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
F41A21/484 (EP,KR,US);
F41A3/26 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Title | German: | VERRIEGELTES MASCHINENGEWEHR | [2005/13] | English: | LOCKED MACHINE GUN | [2005/13] | French: | MITRAILLEUSE A CULASSE VERROUILLEE | [2005/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.12.2006 | CZ | 20.12.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | EE | 20.12.2006 | FI | 20.12.2006 | IE | 20.12.2006 | RO | 20.12.2006 | SI | 20.12.2006 | SK | 20.12.2006 | TR | 20.12.2006 | BG | 20.03.2007 | GR | 21.03.2007 | LU | 05.06.2007 | HU | 21.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 20.12.2006 | |
CZ | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
EE | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
LU | 05.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
EE | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 20.12.2006 | |
BG | 20.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE299713 (MAUSER ET AL.) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE130278 (ROTH); | [A]US1648833 (VINÇON) [A] 1-4 * page 2, column L, line 8 - line 19; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US1744162 (HATCHER JAMES L) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3645165 (WOHLFORD WILLIAM P) [Y] 1-6 * column 2, line 3 - line 16 * * column 2, line 60 - line 73 * * column 3, line 49 - line 58; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3772959 (TASSIE D) [A] 1 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 67; figures 1-9 *; | [YD]EP0803698 (HECKLER & KOCH GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2625766 |