EP1523461 - NATURAL FERTILISER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kummer, Andreas Goethestrasse 26 04668 Grimma / DE | [2005/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Gulde, Klaus W., et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | Gulde, Klaus W., Dipl.-Chem., et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 03762671.0 | 09.07.2003 | [2005/16] | WO2003EP07413 | Priority number, date | DE2002131910 | 09.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10231910 | DE2002211582U | 09.07.2002 Original published format: DE 20211582 U | [2005/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004005217 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1523461 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C05F3/00 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
C05F3/00 (EP,US);
Y02A40/20 (EP,US);
Y02P20/133 (EP,US);
Y02P20/145 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C05F3/00, C05F11/08, C05G5/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NATURDÜNGER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2005/16] | English: | NATURAL FERTILISER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2005/16] | French: | ENGRAIS NATUREL A BASE DE FUMIER DE CHEVAL ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2005/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 06.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 25.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2005 | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2007 | 31.07.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2008 | 31.07.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2009 | 31.07.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2444015 (LEGRIX GEORGES) [X] 1-5,10-18,22-26,31-39,43-46 * claims 1-5 * * page 1, line 16 - page 2, line 25 * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 30 * * page 5, line 30 - line 36 *; | [X]FR2166271 (SPEICHIM [FR]) [X] 1-5,10-18,22-26,31-39,43-46 * claim - * * page 1, line 18 - line 31 *; | [X]EP0291652 (BAUMGARTNER EUGEN) [X] 43-46 * claim - * | by applicant | DE2334494 |