EP1552464 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING SECURE IDENTIFICATION SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neology, Inc. 12760 Danielson Ct, Suite A Poway, CA 92064 / US | [2017/02] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Neology, Inc. 13000 Gregg Street Suite A San Diego, CA 92064 / US | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states BNC IP Switzerland GmbH Saegestrasse 5 9230 Flawil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORTINA, Francisco, Martinez de Velasco Sierra Amatapec 213 Lomas de Chapultepec, D.F.11000 / MX | 02 /
RIETZLER, Manfred Am Alsterberg 10 87616 Marktoberdorf / DE | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/02] | Johnson, Carrie-Anne Louise Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03762852.6 | 09.07.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003IB03702 | Priority number, date | US20020394241P | 09.07.2002 Original published format: US 394241 P | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004006165 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1552464 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552464 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G06K19/07, G06K19/10 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
G06K7/0008 (EP);
G06Q20/32 (US);
G06K19/0723 (EP);
G06K19/07758 (EP);
G06K19/0776 (EP);
G06K19/07764 (EP);
G06K19/10 (EP);
G06Q20/34 (US);
G06Q20/3674 (US);
G07C9/257 (EP);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3278 (US);
G06Q2220/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GESICHERTEN IDENTIFIZIERUNG | [2016/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING SECURE IDENTIFICATION SOLUTIONS | [2005/28] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR DES SOLUTIONS D'IDENTIFICATION SECURISEES | [2005/28] |
Former [2005/28] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG SICHERER IDENTIFIKATIONSLÖSUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10182033.0 / EP2273422 | EP17154851.4 / EP3223186 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE Bundesdruckerei GmbH T IP Kommandantenstrasse 18 10969 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 50 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE Bundesdruckerei GmbH T IP Kommandantenstrasse 18 10969 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | 20.11.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.03.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/30] | 07.03.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.2010 | 31.07.2013 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2003 | AT | 11.01.2017 | CY | 11.01.2017 | CZ | 11.01.2017 | DK | 11.01.2017 | EE | 11.01.2017 | ES | 11.01.2017 | FI | 11.01.2017 | IT | 11.01.2017 | MC | 11.01.2017 | NL | 11.01.2017 | RO | 11.01.2017 | SE | 11.01.2017 | SI | 11.01.2017 | SK | 11.01.2017 | TR | 11.01.2017 | BG | 11.04.2017 | GR | 12.04.2017 | PT | 11.05.2017 | IE | 09.07.2017 | LU | 09.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/21] | HU | 09.07.2003 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.07.2003 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19608757 (BROSOW JOERGEN [AT]) [X] 1,2,49,51,52 * abstract *; | [X]US6268796 (GNADINGER ALFRED [US], et al) [X] 1,2,49,51,52 * claim 1 *; | [X]US6276607 (SATO KAZUO [JP]) [X] 1,2,49,51,52* abstract * | Examination | EP0993999 | Opposition | US5131038 | US5623637 | US5629981 | DE19608757 | EP0856818 | WO0000923 | EP0993999 | US6111506 | US6128398 | US6219439 | US6268796 | US6276607 | US6325285 | EP1205405 | US6484260 | US2003071718 | - MENEZES et al., Handbook of Applied Cryptography, (19970000), pages 394 - 395, XP055421880 | - "Definition of the verb "to verify"", Merriam-Webster Dictionary, URL: https://www.merriam-webster.com/dictionary/verify |