EP1552514 - TAPE THREADING APPARATUS HAVING TAKE-UP HUB WITH GAP FILLING BLOCK FOR DATA STORAGE SYSTEMS AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Segway Systems, Llc 10488 West Centennial Road Littleton, CO 80123 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Segway Systems, LLC 10488 West Centennial Road Littleton, CO 80123 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAVIT, Stephan, E. deceased / US | 02 /
GOLDSMITH, Christopher, D. 8219 W. Laurel Place, Unit A Littleton, CO 80128 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
GAVIT, Stephan, E. 10488 W. Centennial Road Littleton, CO 80123 / US | ||
02 /
GOLDSMITH, Christopher, D. 8219 W. Laurel Place, Unit A Littleton, CO 80128 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03762987.0 | 06.06.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US17836 | Priority number, date | US20020189813 | 03.07.2002 Original published format: US 189813 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004006241 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1552514 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/66 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
G11B15/674 (EP,US);
G11B15/673 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Title | German: | BANDSPULENVORRICHTUNG MIT AUFNAHMENNABE MIT LÜCKENFÜLLBLOCK FÜR DATENSPEICHERSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/28] | English: | TAPE THREADING APPARATUS HAVING TAKE-UP HUB WITH GAP FILLING BLOCK FOR DATA STORAGE SYSTEMS AND METHOD THEREFOR | [2005/28] | French: | APPAREIL DE BOBINAGE DE BANDE COMPORTANT UN NOYAU DE TENSION POURVU D'UN BLOC DE REMPLISSAGE DE TROU POUR SYSTEMES DE STOCKAGE DE DONNEES ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 21.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/33] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6364232 (NEMETH ROBERT [AT], et al); | [XP]US6540167 (SASAKI MAKOTO [JP], et al) |