EP1532827 - SHORT MESSAGE CONVERSION BETWEEN DIFFERENT FORMATS FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIDA, Nobuyuki 8520 Costa Verde Boulevard, 3109 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 02 /
QU, Hai, Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/50] | 01 /
UCHIDA, Nobuyuki 8520 Costa Verde Boulevard, 3109 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | ||
02 /
QU, Hai 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
UCHIDA, Nobuyuki 8520 Costa Verde Boulevard, 3109 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | ||
02 /
QU, Hai 12747 Via Nieve San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Emde, Eric C. Wagner & Geyer, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03763447.4 | 09.07.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003US21596 | Priority number, date | US20020192134 | 09.07.2002 Original published format: US 192134 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004006595 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1532827 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1532827 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
H04W4/14 (EP,BR,US);
H04L51/066 (EP,BR,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,BR,US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
H04W88/184 (EP,US);
H04W92/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KURZNACHRICHTENUMSETZUNG ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN FORMATEN FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME | [2006/36] | English: | SHORT MESSAGE CONVERSION BETWEEN DIFFERENT FORMATS FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2005/21] | French: | CONVERSION DE MESSAGES COURTS ENTRE DIFFERENTS FORMATS POUR SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2005/21] |
Former [2005/21] | KURZNACHRICHTENUMSETZUNG ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN FORMATEN F R DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 18.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07000110.2 / EP1768427 | EP09013538.5 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 28.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2007 | BE | 21.02.2007 | CH | 21.02.2007 | CY | 21.02.2007 | CZ | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | EE | 21.02.2007 | LI | 21.02.2007 | NL | 21.02.2007 | RO | 21.02.2007 | SI | 21.02.2007 | SK | 21.02.2007 | TR | 21.02.2007 | BG | 22.05.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | ES | 01.06.2007 | IE | 09.07.2007 | LU | 09.07.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | HU | 22.08.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
IE | 09.07.2007 | ||
LU | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
IE | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
IE | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
IE | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CH | 21.02.2007 | |
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0936825 (ALCATEL USA SOURCING LP [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] *; | [X]WO0056110 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * page 2, line 20 - line 31 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 7 * * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 31 * * claims 1,2,5,7,9 *; | [A]WO0056091 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 21 ** page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 25 *; | [X]WO0233985 (UNIVERSAL COMM PLATFORM AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * page 4, line 3 - line 28 * * page 7, line 3 - line 40 * * page 10, line 18 - line 40 * * page 13, line 1 - line 40 * * page 14, line 15 - line 26 * |