EP1551950 - ALPHA-MELANOCYTE STIMULATING HORMONE PEPTIDES PROTECTION IN ORGAN TRANSPLANTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zengen, Inc. Suite 980, 21800 Oxnard Street Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Zengen, Inc. Suite 980, 21800 Oxnard Street Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATTI, Stefano Via Palestro 16 22100 Como / IT | 02 /
LIPTON, James, M 5800 Owensmouth Avenue, Nr 10 Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | 03 /
CATANIA, Anna, P 15 Corso Italia 20122 Milan / IT | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03763472.2 | 10.07.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US21819 | Priority number, date | US20020193470 | 10.07.2002 Original published format: US 193470 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004004551 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1551950 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/00 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
A61K38/34 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/34, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZ DURCH ALPHA-MELANOZYTEN STIMULIERENDE HORMONPEPTIDE BEI DER ORGANTRANSPLANTATION | [2005/28] | English: | ALPHA-MELANOCYTE STIMULATING HORMONE PEPTIDES PROTECTION IN ORGAN TRANSPLANTION | [2005/28] | French: | PROTECTION EN CAS DE TRANSPLANTATION D'ORGANE PAR DES PEPTIDES D'HORMONE STIMULAANT L'ALPHA-MELANOCYTE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 03.11.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - CHIAO H., "Alpha-melanocyte-stimulating hormone protects against renal injury after ischemia in mice and rats", J. CLIN. INVEST., (199703), vol. 99, no. 6, pages 1165 - 1172, XP000945213 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI119272 | [X] - JO S.K., "Alpha-MSH decreases apoptosis in ischaemic acute renal failure in rats: possible mechanism of this beneficial effect", NEPHROL. DIAL. TRANSPLANT, (2001), vol. 16, pages 1583 - 1591, XP002972491 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ndt/16.8.1583 | [Y] - JO S.K., "Alpha-melanocyte stimulating hormone (MSH) decreases cyclosporine A induced apoptosis in cultured human proximal tubular cells", J. KOREAN MED. SCI., (2001), vol. 16, pages 603 - 609, XP002972492 | [A] - POHLEIN C., "Xenogeneic ex vivo hemoperfusion of rhesus monkey livers with human blood", MEDLINE, Database accession no. 8029831, XP002972493 | [ ] - TRANSPLANT PROC., (199406), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 1061 - 1062 |