EP1533375 - METHOD OF TRANSFERRING MUTATION INTO TARGET NUCLEIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKARA BIO INC. 4-1, Seta 3-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2193 / JP | [2009/38] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states TAKARA BIO INC. 4-1, Seta 3-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Chunyu 402, Hamoparesu-Kusatsu 12-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0025 / JP | 02 /
SAGAWA, Hiroaki c/o TAKARA BIO INC. 4-1, Seta 3-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2193 / JP | 03 /
KATO, Ikunoshin TAKARA BIO INC. 4-1 Seta-3-chome Otsu-chi, Shiga 520-2193 / JP | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
CAO, Chunyu 402, Hamoparesu-Kusatsu 12-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0025 / JP | ||
02 /
SAGAWA, Hiroaki c/o TAKARA BIO INC. 4-1, Seta 3-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2193 / JP | |||
03 /
KATO, Ikunoshin Takara Bio Inc. 4-1 Seta-3-chome Otsu-chi, Shiga 520-2193 / JP | |||
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
CAO, Chunyu 402, Hamoparesu-Kusatsu 12-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0025 / JP | ||
02 /
SAGAWA, Hiroaki 6-32, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0025 / JP | |||
03 /
KATO, Ikunoshin Takara Bio Inc. 4-1 Seta-3-chome Otsu-chi, Shiga 520-2193 / JP | |||
Former [2007/03] | 01 /
CAO, Chunyu 402, Hamoparesu-Kusatsu 12-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0025 / JP | ||
02 /
SAGAWA, Hiroaki 6-32, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0025 / JP | |||
03 /
KATO, Ikunoshin Takara Bio Inc. 4-1 Seta-3-chome Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0028 / JP | |||
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
CAO, Chunyu 402, Hamoparesu-Kusatsu 12-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0025 / JP | ||
02 /
SAGAWA, Hiroaki 6-32, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0025 / JP | |||
03 /
KATO, Ikunoshin 1-1-150, Nanryo-cho Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0028 / JP | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/21] | Grund, Martin, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei, Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03764168.5 | 11.07.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003JP08816 | Priority number, date | JP20020204887 | 12.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002204887 | JP20030113534 | 18.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003113534 | [2005/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004007715 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533375 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1533375 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N15/63, C12N15/90, C12Q1/68 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
C07K14/43595 (EP,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/21] | C12N15/09, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINER MUTATION IN EINE ZIELNUKLEINSÄURE | [2005/21] | English: | METHOD OF TRANSFERRING MUTATION INTO TARGET NUCLEIC ACID | [2005/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT DE MUTATION DANS UN ACIDE NUCLEIQUE CIBLE | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2004 | Translation filed | 22.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.09.2009 | BE | 16.09.2009 | BG | 16.09.2009 | CY | 16.09.2009 | CZ | 16.09.2009 | DK | 16.09.2009 | EE | 16.09.2009 | FI | 16.09.2009 | IT | 16.09.2009 | NL | 16.09.2009 | RO | 16.09.2009 | SE | 16.09.2009 | SI | 16.09.2009 | SK | 16.09.2009 | TR | 16.09.2009 | GR | 17.12.2009 | ES | 27.12.2009 | PT | 18.01.2010 | HU | 17.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
HU | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
SE | 16.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0149844 (UNIV RUTGERS [US], et al) [X] 11,14,15 * figures 4-6; claim 7 *; | [X] - PICCIN A ET AL, Efficient and heritable functional knock-out of an adult phenotype in Drosophila using a GAL4-driven hairpin RNA incorporating a heterologous spacer., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH. 15 JUN 2001, VOL. 29, NR. 12, PAGE(S) E55 - E55, (20010615), ISSN 1362-4962, XP002334559 [X] 11,14,15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/29.12.e55 | [X] - WALDMAN ALAN S ET AL, "Long inverted repeats are an at-risk motif for recombination in mammalian cells.", GENETICS, (199912), vol. 153, no. 4, ISSN 0016-6731, pages 1873 - 1883, XP002334555 [X] 11,14,15 * figure 1 * | [A] - BZYMEK MALGORZATA ET AL, "Evidence for two mechanisms of palindrome-stimulated deletion in Escherichia coli: Single-strand annealing and replication slipped mispairing", GENETICS, (200106), vol. 158, no. 2, ISSN 0016-6731, pages 527 - 540, XP002334556 [A] * figure 7 * | [A] - LOBACHEV KIRILL S ET AL, "Factors affecting inverted repeat stimulation of recombination and deletion in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", GENETICS, (199804), vol. 148, no. 4, ISSN 0016-6731, pages 1507 - 1524, XP002334557 [A] * abstract * | International search | [XP]WO0073478 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al); | [X] - STEINWAERDER D.S. ET AL., "Generation of adenovirus vectors devoid of all viral genes by recombination between inverted repeats", J. VIROL., (1999), vol. 73, no. 11, pages 9303 - 9313, XP000914992 | [Y] - GARCIA-BUSTOS J. ET AL., "Nuclear protein localization", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1991), vol. 1071, no. 1, pages 83 - 101, XP002113641 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-4157(91)90013-M | [A] - RECCHIA A. ET AL., "Site-specific integration mediated by a hybrid adenovirus/adeno-associated virus vector", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, no. 6, pages 2615 - 2620, XP002152917 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.6.2615 | Examination | US5643762 | - ELBASHIR ET AL, "Functional anatomy of siRNAs for mediating efficient RNAi in Drosophila melanogaster embryo lysate", EMBO J, (20011203), vol. 20, no. 23, pages 6877 - 6888 |