EP1525408 - HYDRAULIC ACTUATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | [2005/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELTER, Roland Schlosshöhe 4 77815 Bühl / DE | 02 /
ZINK, Matthias Hausäcker 3 7783 Ottenhöfen / DE | 03 /
HAHN, Henry Schulstrasse 4 77815 Bühl / DE | 04 /
POPP, Udo Beethovenstrasse 27 77815 Bühl / DE | 05 /
HAUSNER, Markus Bettina von Arnim Weg 5 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [2005/17] | Application number, filing date | 03764898.7 | 17.07.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003DE02390 | Priority number, date | DE2002132499 | 18.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10232499 | [2005/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004010017 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1525408 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525408 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16D48/06 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
F16D48/06 (KR);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
F16D25/08 (EP);
F16D25/088 (US);
F16D48/02 (EP,US);
F16D48/066 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0638 (EP,US);
F16D2025/081 (EP);
F16D2048/0215 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1026 (EP,US);
F16D2500/10412 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3021 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3026 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3067 (EP,US);
F16D2500/30806 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3115 (EP,US);
F16D2500/31413 (EP,US);
F16D2500/5048 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHES BETÄTIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2005/17] | English: | HYDRAULIC ACTUATION SYSTEM | [2005/17] | French: | SYSTEME D'ACTIONNEMENT HYDRAULIQUE | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 07.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 30.09.2009 | CY | 30.09.2009 | CZ | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | EE | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IE | 30.09.2009 | IT | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | RO | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | SI | 30.09.2009 | SK | 30.09.2009 | TR | 30.09.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | ES | 10.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | HU | 01.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | BG | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS58142035 ; | [XA]DE3736584 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-5; | [X]DE4121016 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4140328 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,5* the whole document *; | [X]DE4142744 (HYDRAULIK RING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 4, paragraphs 3,4 * * figures 1,4,5 * * column 5, paragraph L * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831119), vol. 007, no. 261, Database accession no. (M - 257), & JP58142035 A 19830823 (NIPPON AIR BRAKE KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4142744 |