EP1538901 - COMBINATIONS OF CYCLOHEXANEDIONE OXIME HERBICIDES AND SAFENERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HACKER, Erwin Margarethenstrasse 60 65239 Hochheim / DE | 02 /
BIERINGER, Hermann Eichenweg 26 65817 Eppstein / DE | 03 /
HUFF, Hans, Philipp Eberlestrasse 18 65817 Eppstein / DE | [2005/24] | Application number, filing date | 03764947.2 | 07.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003EP07251 | Priority number, date | EP20020016006 | 18.07.2002 Original published format: EP 02016006 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004008854 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1538901 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1538901 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/50, A01N35/10, A01N43/18, A01N25/32, A01N43/16, // (A01N37/50, 43:56), A01N25:32,(A01N35/10, 43:16, 43:56), A01N25:32,(A01N43/18, 43:16, 43:56), A01N25:32,(A01N43/16, 43:56, 43:56), A01N25:32 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A01N37/50 (EP,US);
A01N35/10 (EP,US);
A01N43/16 (EP,US);
A01N43/18 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N35/10, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N35/10, A01N43/76, A01N43/56, A01N25/32 (US,EP);
A01N37/50, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N37/50, A01N43/56, A01N25/32 (US,EP);
A01N43/16, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/16, A01N43/76, A01N43/56, A01N25/32 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN VON CYCLOHEXANDIONOXIM-HERBIZIDEN UND SAFENERS | [2005/24] | English: | COMBINATIONS OF CYCLOHEXANEDIONE OXIME HERBICIDES AND SAFENERS | [2005/24] | French: | COMBINAISONS D'HERBICIDES ET DE PHYTOPROTECTEURS CYCLOHEXANEDIONE OXIME | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 22.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | BE | 08.03.2006 | CH | 08.03.2006 | CY | 08.03.2006 | CZ | 08.03.2006 | EE | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | LI | 08.03.2006 | NL | 08.03.2006 | RO | 08.03.2006 | SI | 08.03.2006 | SK | 08.03.2006 | BG | 08.06.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | IE | 07.07.2006 | LU | 07.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | HU | 09.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
EE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
LU | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
HU | 09.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
EE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
HU | 09.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
EE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
RO | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5703008 (ROESCH WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 7 - column 5, line 30 *; | [Y]WO9908520 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]WO9957982 (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 11, line 8 - page 12, line 22 *; | [Y]US6124240 (BIERINGER HERMANN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 9, line 27 - column 15, line 24 * |