EP1524957 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MUSCULAR STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABERDEEN UNIVERSITY Research and Innovation University Office, Kings College Aberdeen AB24 3FX / GB | [2009/39] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states ABERDEEN UNIVERSITY Research and Innovation University Office, Kings College Aberdeen AB24 3FX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARDINALE, Marco, Aberdeen University Res. & Innovation, University Off., Kings College Aberdeen AB24 3FX / GB | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03765202.1 | 22.07.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003GB03258 | Priority number, date | GB20020016982 | 22.07.2002 Original published format: GB 0216982 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004009173 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1524957 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1524957 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/02, A61H23/00, A63B21/00 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
A63B21/00196 (EP,US);
A61H1/005 (EP,US);
A61H23/02 (EP,US);
A63B21/00069 (EP,US);
A63B21/078 (EP,US);
A63B23/0405 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MUSKELSTIMULATION | [2005/17] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MUSCULAR STIMULATION | [2005/17] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE STIMULATION MUSCULAIRE | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.09.2009 | BE | 23.09.2009 | BG | 23.09.2009 | CY | 23.09.2009 | CZ | 23.09.2009 | DK | 23.09.2009 | EE | 23.09.2009 | FI | 23.09.2009 | RO | 23.09.2009 | SE | 23.09.2009 | SI | 23.09.2009 | SK | 23.09.2009 | TR | 23.09.2009 | GR | 24.12.2009 | ES | 03.01.2010 | PT | 25.01.2010 | HU | 24.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
BG | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
HU | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
BG | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 23.09.2009 | |
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 23.09.2009 | |
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 23.09.2009 | |
SE | 23.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4705271 (MONDLOCH MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7-11,13,14,19,20,22,23 * column 2, line 52 - column 8, line 45; figures 1-9 *; | [A]SU1447385 (MIKHEEV ALEKSANDR A [SU], et al); | [A]EP0335616 (SHANKSTER RAYMOND EDWIN) [A] 1,3,6,15,19,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US6039679 (YU SIMON S C [US]) [X] 1-3,8,10-14,16,19,20,24 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 26; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1121956 (BOSCO CARMELO [IT]) [A] 1-3,6,9,10,12,13,15-19,21-25 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO02053084 (ARCTIC MEDICAL AS [NO], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13,15-19,21-25 * page 2, line 21 - page 7, line 8; figure 1 * [A] 14 |