EP1540180 - ELECTRONIC FLUID PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMP ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT, LLC 2701 N. 30th Street Escanaba, MI 49829 / US | [2005/50] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Engineered Machined Products, Inc. 3111 N. 28th Street, P.O. Box 1246 Escanaba, MI 49829 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, David, J. 5972 Norway Pine Escanaba Township, MI 49829 / US | 02 /
BADER, Mark 7324 Lake Bluff 0.75 Lane Gladstone, MI 49837 / US | 03 /
CARLSON, Jeremy, S. 7454 S. Lake Bluff 0.5 Drive Gladstone, MI 49837 / US | 04 /
DEGRAVE, Kenneth, A. N14141 County Road 551 Wilson, MI 49896 / US | 05 /
LASECKI, Michael, P. 7786 N. Lake Bluff 0.5 Drive Gladstone, MI 49837 / US | 06 /
SHIVERSKI, Steven N 19989 Shiverski Lane Perronville, MI 49873 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London WC1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 03765450.6 | 18.06.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US19182 | Priority number, date | US20020198687 | 17.07.2002 Original published format: US 198687 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004009999 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540180 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540180 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04B35/04, F04D13/06, F04D29/44, F04D3/00 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
F04D29/448 (EP,US);
F04D13/0633 (EP,US);
F04D3/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/24] | F04B35/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2005/45] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE FLUIDPUMPE | [2005/24] | English: | ELECTRONIC FLUID PUMP | [2005/24] | French: | POMPE ELECTRONIQUE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 16.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Request for further processing for: | 29.01.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.02.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.03.2007 | ES | 25.06.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/24] | ES | 25.06.2007 | |
FR | 02.11.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 25.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1974183 (GUNDERSON NORRIS E) [A] 1,15,22 * the whole document *; | [A]US2554191 (JAKOB HUBER) [A] 1,15,22* the whole document *; | [X]US5494418 (MORIYA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,15,22 * column 4, lines 40-65 * * column 5, lines 10-30 * * column 6, lines 26-40 * * figures 1,17 *; | [AD]US6056518 (ALLEN DAVID J [US], et al) [AD] 1,15,22 * the whole document *; | [A]US6129524 (WOOLLENWEBER WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1,15,22 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US1974183 (GUNDERSON NORRIS E); | [X]US5494418 (MORIYA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2001036409 (MURATA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al); | [A]US5785013 (SINN WALTHER [DE], et al); | [A]US6056518 (ALLEN DAVID J [US], et al) |