EP1546246 - LOW POLARITY DIMERATE AND TRIMERATE ESTERS AS PLASTICIZERS FOR ELASTOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CPH Innovations Corp. 311 South Wacker Drive Suite 4700 Chicago, Illinois 60606-6622 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states CPH Innovations Corp. 311 South Wacker Drive Suite 4700 Chicago, Illinois 60606-6622 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'ROURKE, Stephen, E. 1847 Marne Road Bolingbrook, IL 60490 / US | 02 /
STEFANISIN, Kimberly, L. 4867 Wick Drive Oak Lawn, IL 60453 / US | 03 /
WENTWORTH, Gary 5540 North Wayne Avenue Chicago, IL 60640 / US | 04 /
SHAH, Urvil, B. 9923 Cambridge Court Mokena, IL 60448 / US | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Janssen, Bernd Christian Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Janssen, Bernd Christian Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03765554.5 | 10.07.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US21866 | Priority number, date | US20020396453P | 17.07.2002 Original published format: US 396453 P | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004009693 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1546246 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/12, C08L21/00, C10M105/36 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
C08K5/0016 (EP,US);
C08K5/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0016, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/12, C08L21/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NIEDERPOLARE DIMERAT- UND TRIMERATESTER ALS WEICHMACHER F R ELASTOMERE | [2005/26] | English: | LOW POLARITY DIMERATE AND TRIMERATE ESTERS AS PLASTICIZERS FOR ELASTOMERS | [2005/26] | French: | UTILISATION D'ESTERS DE DIMERATE ET DE TRIMERATE A FAIBLE POLARITE EN TANT QUE PLASTIFIANTS POUR ELASTOMERES | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 02.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP1304210 (BYK CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,2,21-24* example -; claims 1,3,14 * |