EP1527525 - DYNAMIC FORWARD ERROR CORRECTION IN UTRA SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARINIER, Paul 1805 Stravinski Brossard, Quebec City J4X 2J7 / CA | 02 /
CUFFARO, Angelo 3837 Place du Brigadier Laval, Quebec H7E 5M7 / CA | 03 /
CAVE, Christopher 63 Place Chambord Candiac, Quebec J5R 4W7 / CA | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03765590.9 | 14.07.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003US22102 | Priority number, date | US20020397360P | 19.07.2002 Original published format: US 397360 P | US20020329308 | 23.12.2002 Original published format: US 329308 | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004010598 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1527525 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/44, H04B7/212, H04L5/14, H04L1/00 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
H04L1/0009 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/2643 (KR);
H04L1/0006 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0013 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0016 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0061 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/18] | H04B1/44, H04B7/212, H04L5/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE VORWÄRTSFEHLERKORREKTOR IN UTRA-SYSTEMEN | [2005/18] | English: | DYNAMIC FORWARD ERROR CORRECTION IN UTRA SYSTEMS | [2005/18] | French: | CORRECTION AVAL D ERREUR DYNAMIQUE DANS DES SYSTEMES UTRA | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 16.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1077576 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC TELECOM EU [FR]) [X] 1* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0040] *; | [Y]US2001021229 (BELAICHE VINCENT ANTOINE VICTO [FR]) [Y] 2,3 * paragraph [0063] *; | [XY]WO0217549 (SASKEN COMM TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * page 5, line 8 - page 9, line 8 * [Y] 2,3; | [X]US2002054578 (ZHANG QIAN [CN], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0150] *; | [X]US2002085531 (HERRMANN CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0040] *; | [XY]WO02056556 (SASKEN COMM TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * page 3, line 32 - page 10, line 30; figure 9 * [Y] 2,3 | International search | [A]US2002001287 (BERGENWALL MARTIN [FI], et al); | [Y]US2002021698 (LEE YU-RO [KR], et al); | [Y]US2002042283 (MOULSLEY TIMOTHY J [GB]); | [X]US2002071407 (KOO CHANG-HOI [KR], et al); | [A]US6490461 (MUELLER WALTER [SE]) |