EP1523314 - PYRAZOLOPYRIMIDINES AS PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DICKERSON, Scott, Howard, c/o GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 02 /
GARRIDO, Dulce, Maria, c/o GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 03 /
MILLS, Wendy, Yoon, c/o GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 04 /
KANO, Kazuya, c/o Tsukuba Research Laboratories 43 Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki Pref 300-4247 / JP | 05 /
PEAT, Andrew, James, c/o GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 06 /
THOMSON, Stephen, Andrew, c/o GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 07 /
WILSON, Jayme, Lyn, Roark, c/o GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 08 /
ZHOU, Huiqiang, c/o GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Learoyd, Stephanie Anne GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | Learoyd, Stephanie Anne GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03765828.3 | 21.07.2003 | [2005/16] | WO2003US22719 | Priority number, date | US20020397947P | 23.07.2002 Original published format: US 397947 P | [2005/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004009597 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1523314 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, C07D487/04, A61P3/00 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 03.02.2005 | LV | 03.02.2005 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRAZOLOPYRIMIDINE ALS PROTEINKINASE-INHIBITOREN | [2005/16] | English: | PYRAZOLOPYRIMIDINES AS PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS | [2005/16] | French: | PYRAZOLOPYRIMIDINES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE KINASES | [2005/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/32] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0119829 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-20,36-40 * page 1 - page 13; claim 1 * | [X] - BHAT ET AL., "Pyrazolopyrimidine Nucleosides. 12. Synthesis and Biological Activity of Certain Pyrazolo[3,4-d]pyrimidine Nucleosides Related to Adenosine", J. MED. CHEM., (1981), vol. 24, pages 1165 - 1172, XP002267111 [X] 1,10,11,16,36,37 * Cpds. 6, 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00142a009 |