EP1525449 - IMPEDANCE MEASUREMENT IN A FLUIDIC MICROSYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evotec Technologies GmbH Merowingerplatz 1a 40225 Düsseldorf / DE | [2007/14] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Evotec OAI AG Schnackenburgallee 114 22525 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNELLE, Thomas Koppenstrasse 65 10843 Berlin / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Torsten Hartriegelstrasse 39 12439 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SHIRLEY, Stephen Victoria Main Street Brandon, Warks CV8 38W / GB | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Hertz, Oliver V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Hertz, Oliver, Dr. v. Bezold & Sozien Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03766323.4 | 28.07.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003EP08312 | Priority number, date | DE20021034487 | 29.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10234487 | [2005/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004013614 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525449 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/12, // (G01N27/02, C12M1:42, B03C5:02) | [2005/17] | CPC: |
G01N15/131 (EP,US);
G01N2015/133 (EP,US);
G01N2015/135 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPEDANZMESSUNG IN EINEM FLUIDISCHEN MIKROSYSTEM | [2005/17] | English: | IMPEDANCE MEASUREMENT IN A FLUIDIC MICROSYSTEM | [2005/17] | French: | MESURE D'IMPEDANCE DANS UN MICROSYSTEME FLUIDIQUE | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2201894 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1-10,12,14-17,19,20,27 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4420720 (NEWTON WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-20,27,28 * the whole document * [Y] 21,22; | [DAY]WO0037628 (EVOTEC BIOSYSTEMS AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-28 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 24 * * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 19, paragraph 2 * * page 13, line 1 - page 13, line 4 * * page 14, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-11 * [Y] 22,21; | [X]US2002076690 (MILES ROBIN R [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10059152 (EVOTEC AG [DE]) [A] 17,18,21-23* the whole document *; | [PX]US2002150886 (MILES ROBIN R [US], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document * |