EP1527059 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROPENYL OXIDE USING A SECONDARY REACTOR COMPRISING SEVERAL FEED AND/OR OUTLET POINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖBBEL, Hans-Georg Im Mosenborn 33 67169 Kallstadt / DE | 02 /
BASSLER, Peter Maria-Mandel-Strasse 18 68519 Viernheim / DE | 03 /
TELES, Joaquim, Henrique Reiherstrasse 29a 67166 Otterstadt / DE | 04 /
RUDOLF, Peter Rautenthalermühle 12 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr. Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03766328.3 | 28.07.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003EP08317 | Priority number, date | DE20021034448 | 29.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10234448 | [2005/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004013116 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1527059 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1527059 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D301/12, C07D303/02 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
C07D301/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PROPENYLOXID UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES NACHREAKTORS MIT MEHREREN EINSPEISE- UND/ODER ABLAUFSTELLEN | [2005/18] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROPENYL OXIDE USING A SECONDARY REACTOR COMPRISING SEVERAL FEED AND/OR OUTLET POINTS | [2005/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'OXYDE DE PROPYLENE A L'AIDE D'UN REACTEUR COMPLEMENTAIRE COMPORTANT PLUSIEURS POINTS D'ALIMENTATION ET/OU D'EXPLOITATION | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 30.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.02.2006 | CZ | 22.02.2006 | EE | 22.02.2006 | FI | 22.02.2006 | GB | 22.02.2006 | IE | 22.02.2006 | RO | 22.02.2006 | SI | 22.02.2006 | SK | 22.02.2006 | TR | 22.02.2006 | BG | 22.05.2006 | DK | 22.05.2006 | SE | 22.05.2006 | GR | 23.05.2006 | ES | 02.06.2006 | PT | 24.07.2006 | AT | 28.07.2006 | LU | 28.07.2006 | BE | 31.07.2006 | FR | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | DE | 12.08.2006 | HU | 23.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
EE | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
TR | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
AT | 28.07.2006 | ||
LU | 28.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
HU | 23.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
EE | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
AT | 28.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
HU | 23.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
EE | 22.02.2006 | ||
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
AT | 28.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
AT | 28.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
AT | 28.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 22.02.2006 | |
FI | 22.02.2006 | ||
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
GR | 23.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
AT | 28.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
AT | 28.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
IT | 22.02.2006 | ||
RO | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
GB | 22.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 24.07.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SK | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
DK | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
DE | 12.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
BG | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
SE | 22.05.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
SI | 22.02.2006 | ||
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 22.02.2006 | |
ES | 02.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 02.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5349072 (PRESTON KYLE L [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [YD]WO0007965 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-11 * Ansprüche, Beispiele *; | [Y]WO0170712 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [PY]EP1266892 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PY] 1-11 |