EP1542097 - HOLOGRAM RECORDING/REPRODUCING METHOD AND HOLOGRAM RECORDING/REPRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBOTA, Yoshihisa, Pioneer Corporation Corporate R&D Laboratory, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Satoru, Pioneer Corporation Corporate R&D Laboratory, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Yoshihisa, Pioneer Corporation Corporate R&D Laboratory, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 04 /
TACHIBANA, Akihiro, Pioneer Corporation Corporate R&D Laboratory, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 05 /
KURODA, Kazuo, Pioneer Corporation Corporate R&D Laboratory, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 06 /
SUGIURA, Satoshi, Pioneer Corporation Corporate R&D Laboratory, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Neugebauer, Jürgen, et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Neugebauer, Jürgen, Dipl.Phys., et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03766662.5 | 30.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003JP09649 | Priority number, date | JP20020225052 | 01.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002225052 | JP20020225053 | 01.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002225053 | [2005/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004013706 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542097 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/04, G03H1/22, G03H1/18, G11B7/0065 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G11B7/128 (EP,US);
G03H1/0402 (EP,US);
G03H1/0404 (EP,US);
G03H1/16 (EP,US);
G03H1/26 (EP,US);
G11B7/0065 (EP,US);
G11B7/1353 (EP,US);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
G03H1/0493 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/47] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOLOGRAMMAUFZEICHNUNGS-/-WIEDERGABEVERFAHREN UND HOLOGRAMMAUFZEICHNUNGS-/-WIEDERGABEEINRICHTUNG | [2005/24] | English: | HOLOGRAM RECORDING/REPRODUCING METHOD AND HOLOGRAM RECORDING/REPRODUCING DEVICE | [2005/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION ET D'ENREGISTREMENT D'HOLOGRAMMES | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2005 | Translation filed | 27.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 08.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/07] | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5917798 (HORIMAI HIDEYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0215176 (OPTWARE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US2002085250 (KIM JI-DEOG [KR], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [PA]US2002135832 (EDWARDS JATHAN D [US]) [PA] 1-21 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH09311615 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JP2000105528 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]US6373806 (KITAMURA KENJI [JP], et al); | [XP]US2002135832 (EDWARDS JATHAN D [US]) |