EP1546285 - NITRIFICATION INHIBITOR TREATMENT OF GRAZED PASTURE SOILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lincoln University Ellesmere Junction Road Lincoln, Canterbury / NZ | For all designated states Ravensdown Fertiliser Co-operative Limited Deloitte House, Level 1, 32 Oxford Terrace Christchurch / NZ | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMERON, Keith Craig 38 Kildare Terrace Lincoln, Canterbury / NZ | 02 /
DI, Hong Jie 105 Patterson Terrace Halswell, Christchurch / NZ | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Neil Boyd Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Campbell, Neil Boyd Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03766789.6 | 01.08.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003NZ00169 | Priority number, date | NZ20020520549 | 02.08.2002 Original published format: NZ 52054902 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004013253 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1546285 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09K17/02, C05G3/08, A01C21/00 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
A01C21/00 (EP,US);
C05G3/90 (EP,US);
Y02P60/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/26] | C09K17/02, C05G3/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NITRIFIKATIONSHEMMENDE BEHANDLUNG VON WEIDEB DEN | [2005/26] | English: | NITRIFICATION INHIBITOR TREATMENT OF GRAZED PASTURE SOILS | [2005/26] | French: | TRAITEMENT INHIBITEUR DE NITRIFICATION DES SOLS DE PATURAGE | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 19.01.2005 | Observations by third parties | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 26.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0289757 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF [DE]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * page 2, lines 1,2 * * page 2, line 39 - line 42 * * page 3, line 7 - line 29 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US5741345 (GRABARSE MARGRIT [DE], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * column 1, lines 9-11 * * column 2, line 4 - line 20 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US6315807 (PATRA DHARANI DHAR [IN], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 6 - line 36 * * column 4, line 9 - line 27 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP1183929 (FLEXI COIL LTD [CA]) [X] 19,20 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 2 * * column 2, paragraphs 9-11 * * column 3, paragraphs 16-18 * * column 6, paragraphs 27,28 * * column 7, paragraph 31 ** figure -; claim - * | International search | [X]WO0219809 (QUIN BERT F [NZ]); | [X] - WILLIAMSON J.C. ET AL., "Reducing nitrogen leaching from dairy farm effluent-irrigated pasture using dicyandiamide. A lysimeter study", AGRICULTURE, ECOSYSTEMS & ENVIRONMENT, (1998), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 81 - 88, XP008092722 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-8809(98)00099-1 | [X] - THOMPSON R.B., "Denitrification in slurry-treated soil: occurrence at low temperatures, relationship with soil nitrate and reduction by nitrification inhibitors", SOIL BIOLOGY & BIOCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 875 - 882, XP008095062 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0038-0717(89)90075-8 | [X] - AKAI N. ET AL., "Effects of nitrification inhibitors added to cow's urine on environmental burdens from grassland", CABA, Database accession no. 2002:2157, XP008093046 | [ ] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF SOIL SCIENCE AND PLANT NUTRITION, (2001), vol. 72, no. 2, pages 206 - 213 | [Y] - WHITMORE A.P., "Impact of liverstock on soil", VIRTUAL CONFERENCE, (20020323), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20020323105410re_/agriculture.de/acms1/conf6/ws4lives.htm, XP008092983 | [Y] - WOZNIAK H. ET AL., "Nitrification inhibitors for economically efficient and environmentally friendly nitrogen fertilization", IFA AGRICULTURAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGING PLANT NITRITION, BARCELONA, SPAIN, (19990629), URL: http://www.fertilizer.org/ifa/publicat/PDF/1999_biblio_26.pdf, XP008092984 | [XP] - COOKSON W.R. ET AL., "Dicyandiamide slows nitrification in dairy cattle urine patches: effects on soil solution composition, soil pH and pasture yield", SOIL BIOLOGY & BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 34, no. 10, pages 1461 - 1465, XP008095065 | [XP] - DI H.J. ET AL., "The use of a nitrification inhibitor, dicyandiamide (DCD) to decrease nitrate leaching and nitrous oxide emissions in a simulated grazed and irrigated grassland", SOIL USE AND MANAGEMENT, (2002), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 395 - 403, XP008095063 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1079/SUM2002151 |