EP1540708 - BATCH FURNACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wafermasters, Incorporated 246 East Gish Road San Jose, CA 95112 / US | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Woo, Sik 4180 Wallis Ct. Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
FUKADA, Takashi 3-7-2, Ohzu-Machi, Kikuchi-gun Kumamoto 869-1237 / JP | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
YOO, Woo, Sik 3090 Stelling Drive Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
02 /
FUKADA, Takashi 3-7-2, Ohzu-Machi, Kikuchi-gun Kumamoto 869-1237 / JP | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03766990.0 | 30.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US23849 | Priority number, date | US20020211757 | 02.08.2002 Original published format: US 211757 | US20020313707 | 05.12.2002 Original published format: US 313707 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004013901 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1540708 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, C23C16/455, C23C16/453 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H01L21/67115 (EP);
H01L21/324 (KR);
C23C16/46 (EP);
H01L21/67109 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Title | German: | BATCH-OFEN | [2005/24] | English: | BATCH FURNACE | [2005/24] | French: | FOUR DE CUISSON PAR LOTS | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 15.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6191388 (CLEAVER MARK P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-20 * column 2, lines 27-48; figure 1 * [A] 4,11; | [XA]US6407368 (HSU CHUN-KENG [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-20 * column 4, lines 49-54; figures 3,4 * [A] 4,11; | [XA]US4723508 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-19 * columns 1-2; figure 1 * [A] 3,10,20; | [XA]WO9839609 (SEMITOOL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-20 * page 12, lines 18-24; figures 2,3 * [A] 4,11 |