EP1530582 - DIAGNOSIS OF KIDNEY DAMAGE AND PROTECTION AGAINST SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OHIO UNIVERSITY Technology Transfer Office Unit 14, 340 West State Street Athens, Ohio 45701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states Ohio University Technology Transfer Office, Unit 14, 340 West State Street Athens, Ohio 45701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOPCHICK, John, J. 4 Orchard Lane Athens, OH 45701 / US | 02 /
COSCHIGANO, Karen, T. 11703 Channingway Blvd. The Plains, OH 45780 / US | 03 /
WETZEL, Amy, N. 7365 Palmleaf Lane Columbus, OH 43235-4210 / US | [2007/10] |
Former [2005/20] | 01 /
KOPCHICK, John, J. 4 Orchard Lane Athens, OH 45701 / US | ||
02 /
COSCHIGANO, Karen, T. 11703 Channingway Blvd. The Plains, OH 45780 / US | |||
03 /
HOLLAND, Amy, N. 2518 Cleveland Road Wooster, OH 44691 / US | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | HOEIBERG A/S European Patent & Trademark Attorneys Store Kongensgade 59A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 03767048.6 | 04.08.2003 | [2005/20] | WO2003US24053 | Priority number, date | US20020400052P | 02.08.2002 Original published format: US 400052 P | [2005/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004013289 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1530582 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, C07K17/00, C12Q1/00, C12N15/63, A61K38/00, A61K48/00, A61K38/17, A61P13/12 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
A61K38/177 (EP,US);
A61K38/465 (EP,US);
A61K38/53 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/03 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/20] | C07H21/04, C07K17/00, C12Q1/00, C12N15/63, A61K38/00, A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/20] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSE VON NIERENSCHADEN UND PREVENTION DAGEGEN | [2005/20] | English: | DIAGNOSIS OF KIDNEY DAMAGE AND PROTECTION AGAINST SAME | [2005/20] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC DES LESIONS RENALES ET PREVENTION DE CES DERNIERES | [2005/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 18.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9518225 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [Y] 1,4,6-10 * page 11, lines 17-32 * * page 9, lines 4-15 * * page 8 * * page 7, lines 23-35 * * page 1, lines 1-5 * * abstract *; | [Y]US5654170 (KLINGER KATHERINE W [US], et al) [Y] 1,4,6-10 * column 11, lines 38-40 * * column 10, lines 10-67 * * column 7, lines 18-20 * * column 6, lines 40-55 * * column 2, lines 33-48 * * column 1, lines 4-7 * * abstract *; | [Y]EP0825260 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1,4,6-10 * page 12 - page 22 * * page 10, lines 22-25 * * page 9, lines 18-22,42-44 * * page 7, lines 49-52 * * page 4, lines 6-15,53-55 * * page 3, lines 1-5 * * page 2, lines 54-57 * * abstract *; | [Y] - ZHANG H ET AL, "Screening for genes up-regulated in 5/6 nephrectomized mouse kidney.", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (1999), vol. 56, pages 549 - 558, XP002486991 [Y] 1,4,6-10 * page 557, column 2 * * page 555, column 2 * * page 552, column 3 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1755.1999.00561.x | [Y] - CEBRIAN C ET AL, "Kidney Androgen-regulated Protein Interacts with Cyclosphilin B and Reduces Cyclosporine A-mediated Toxicity in Proximal Tubule Cells.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 276, no. 31, pages 29410 - 29419, XP002486992 [Y] 1,4,6-10 * page 29418, column 3 * * page 29415, column 5 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M102916200 | International search | [Y]US5734016 (LEVENS DAVID L [US], et al); | [Y]US5580760 (LEVENS DAVID L [US], et al); | [YE]US2003220249 (HACKETT PERRY B [US], et al); | [Y] - HATAKEYAMA S. ET AL., "Subcellular localization and ubiquitin-conjugating enzyme (E2) interactions of mammalian HECT family ubiquitin protein ligases", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19970613), vol. 272, no. 24, pages 15085 - 15092, XP002977198 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.24.15085 | [Y] - XU X-X. ET AL., "Disabled-2 (Dab2) is an SH3 domain-binding partner of Grb2", ONCOGENE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 1561 - 1569, XP002977199 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1201678 |