EP1539831 - A PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING POLYVINYLBUTYRAL PHYSICAL PROPERTIES BY CONTROLLING STEREOCHEMISTRY OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYMER, Donald, L. 2433 School House Road Little Hocking, OH 45742 / US | 02 /
READ, Nolan, K., III 2 Chadwick Square Vienna, WV 26105 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Morf, Jan Stefan Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Morf, Jan Stefan, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München (Bogenhausen) / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | Morf, Jan Stefan, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte Abitz und Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03767167.4 | 04.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US24380 | Priority number, date | US20020400672P | 02.08.2002 Original published format: US 400672 P | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004013191 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539831 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539831 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/28, C08K5/00 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C08J3/18 (EP,US);
C08F8/48 (EP,US);
C08K5/41 (EP,US);
C08K5/42 (EP,US);
C08J2329/14 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/48, C08F8/28, C08F16/06 (US,EP);
C08K5/41, C08L29/14 (US,EP);
C08K5/42, C08L29/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/47] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER PHYSIKALISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN VON POLYVINYLBUTYRAL DURCH STEUERUNG VON DESSEN STEREOCHEMIE | [2005/24] | English: | A PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING POLYVINYLBUTYRAL PHYSICAL PROPERTIES BY CONTROLLING STEREOCHEMISTRY OF SAME | [2005/24] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REGULER LES PROPRIETES PHYSIQUES DU POLYVINYLBUTYRAL (PVB) PAR REGULATION DE LA STEREOCHIMIE DE CELUI-CI | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 20.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS58191701 ; | [A]JPH01319506 ; | [DY]GB923480 (DU PONT) [DY] 1-18 * page 1, line 59 - page 2, line 3; claims 1-13 *; | [A]EP0000699 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-7 *; | [Y]EP0174480 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0287416 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DY]EP0402213 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [DY] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0532489 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [Y] 1-18 * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 29; claims 1-18 *; | [A]GB2290300 (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-17 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 51, Database accession no. 1983-846827, XP002260929 & JPS58191701 A 19831109 (DAIICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO., LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 06, Database accession no. 1990-041643, XP002260930 & JPH01319506 A 19891225 (SEKISUI CHEM. IND. CO., LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * |