EP1590535 - A FENCE PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOEHMKE, Thomas 36 Meeking Drive Pakenham, Victoria 3810 / AU | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/44] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 D-40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03767316.7 | 31.12.2003 | [2005/44] | WO2003AU01731 | Priority number, date | AU20030900022 | 06.01.2003 Original published format: AU 2003900022 | AU20030257926 | 29.10.2003 Original published format: AU 2003257926 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004061252 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1590535 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04H17/16 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
E04H17/166 (EP,US);
E04H17/143 (EP,US);
E04H17/1447 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/44] | E04B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAUNPLATTE | [2005/44] | English: | A FENCE PANEL | [2005/44] | French: | PANNEAU DE BARRIERE | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 05.07.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA889055 (PARISIEN RUDOLPH E) [A] 1-3,6-8,11,12,15-17,19-21,23,25,30,37 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 9; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4272060 (STAFFORD ROBERT T) [A] 1-3,7-12,14-21,23,28,30-33,36,37 * column 2, line 24 - column 6, line 45; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2116597 (BRUNO MICHAEL ROGER) [A] 1,16,20,21,23,28* abstract *; | [A]US5496016 (PARISIEN HARVEY E [CA]) [A] 1-4,6-8,11,12,14-17,19-21,23,28,30,32,37 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-10 *; | [PA]US2003122116 (CALVERLEY ANTHONY R [US]) [PA] 1-3,11-17,19-21,23-25,28 * page 1, paragraph 5 * * page 3, paragraph 55 * * page 3, paragraph 57 - page 4, paragraph 64; figures 1-4A,7 * | International search | [A]GB2151743 (TODD JOHN WILLIAM, et al) |