EP1562817 - HYDRAULIC POWER-ASSISTED STEERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth AG Heidehofstrasse 31 70184 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGMANN, Erhard Kieckut 12 19079 Mirow / DE | 02 /
SCHILDMANN, Manfred Mühlenstrasse 7 c 19370 Parchim / DE | 03 /
VOSS, Gerhard Juri-Gagarin-Ring 64 19370 Parchim / DE | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Jaap, Reinhard Buchholzallee 32 19370 Parchim / DE | [2005/33] | Application number, filing date | 03767401.7 | 04.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003DE03649 | Priority number, date | DE2002152215 | 11.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10252215 | [2005/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004043768 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1562817 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1562817 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/093 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
B62D5/093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BG, DE, DK, IT [2006/09] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE LENKEINRICHTUNG MIT STROMVERSTÄRKUNG | [2005/33] | English: | HYDRAULIC POWER-ASSISTED STEERING DEVICE | [2005/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION HYDRAULIQUE A AMPLIFICATION DE DEBIT | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 20.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/41] | IT | 19.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0725001 (HYDRAULIK NORD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 33 *; | [D]EP0725001 (HYDRAULIK NORD GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE2228531 | EP0725001 |