EP1480811 - METHOD FOR COATING THE OUTER SIDE OF A SANITARY OUTLET PART, AND CORRESPONDING SANITARY OUTLET PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neoperl GmbH Klosterrunsstr. 11 79379 Müllheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Neoperl GmbH Klosterrunsstrasse 11 79379 Müllheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILDFANG, Fabian In der hinteren Au 9 79410 Badenweiler / DE | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Maucher, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03767814.1 | 17.12.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003EP14391 | Priority number, date | DE2003107386 | 21.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10307386 | [2004/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004073959 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1480811 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480811 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29C63/02, B44C1/17, E03C1/08 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
B44C1/1729 (EP,US);
B29C63/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUSSENSEITIGEN BESCHICHTEN EINES SANITÄREN AUSLAUFTEILES SOWIE SANITÄRES AUSLAUFTEIL | [2005/07] | English: | METHOD FOR COATING THE OUTER SIDE OF A SANITARY OUTLET PART, AND CORRESPONDING SANITARY OUTLET PART | [2004/49] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ENDUIRE LA FACE EXTERIEURE D'UNE PIECE DE SORTIE SANITAIRE ET PIECE DE SORTIE SANITAIRE | [2004/49] |
Former [2004/49] | VERFAHREN ZUM AUSSENSEITIGEN BESCHICHTEN EINES SANITÄREN AUSLAUFTEILES SOWIE SANITÄRES | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 01.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.09.2006 | CZ | 27.09.2006 | EE | 27.09.2006 | FI | 27.09.2006 | FR | 27.09.2006 | GB | 27.09.2006 | IE | 27.09.2006 | NL | 27.09.2006 | RO | 27.09.2006 | SI | 27.09.2006 | SK | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | AT | 17.12.2006 | LU | 17.12.2006 | BG | 27.12.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | SE | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | ES | 07.01.2007 | PT | 13.03.2007 | HU | 28.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
FR | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
TR | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 17.12.2006 | ||
LU | 17.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
HU | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
TR | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 17.12.2006 | ||
LU | 17.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
HU | 28.03.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 17.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
HU | 28.03.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 17.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 17.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 17.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 17.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0229242 (WILDFANG DIETER KG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 46 - line 51 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0616905 (GROHE KG HANS [DE]) [A] * column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * column 2, line 21 - line 24 ** column 3, line 44 - line 51 *; | [A]EP0685676 (GROHE KG HANS [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 26 - line 56 * * column 5, line 8 - line 17 * |