EP1587844 - SUPPORTED OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ineos Commercial Services UK Limited Hawkslease Chapel Lane Lyndhurst Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states Ineos Commercial Services UK Limited Hawkslease Chapel lane Lyndhurst Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB | ||
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states INEOS EUROPE LIMITED Hawkslease Chapel Lane Lyndhurst, Hampshire, SO43 7FG / GB | ||
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states INEOS EUROPE LIMITED Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | ||
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states INNOVENE EUROPE LIMITED Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | ||
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states INNOVENE EUROPE LIMITED 79-87 Kingston Road Staines Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | ||
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Innovene Europe Limited Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7BP / GB | ||
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states O & D Trading Limited Chertsey Road Sunbury on Thames Middlesex TW16 7BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSEN, Grant, Berent 343, chemin du Petit Nice F-13320 Bouc-Bel-Air / FR | 02 /
KIMBERLEY, Brian, Stephen 53 Telford Drive Walton on Thames KT12 2YG / GB | 03 /
LALANNE-MAGNE, Claudine, Viviane 32 bis, boulevard Pablo Neruda F-13920 Saint Mitre Les Remparts / FR | 04 /
MASTROIANNI, Sergio 33, avenue des Esperelles, Apt. 203 F-13500 Martigues / FR | [2005/51] |
Former [2005/43] | 01 /
JACOBSEN, Grant, Berent 343, chemin du Petit Nice F-13320 Bouc-Bel-Air / FR | ||
02 /
KIMBERLEY, Brian, Stephen 1116, rue Camille Saint Saens F-13320 Bouc-Bel-Air / FR | |||
03 /
LALANNE-MAGNE, Claudine, Viviane 32 bis, boulevard Pablo Neruda F-13920 Saint Mitre Les Remparts / FR | |||
04 /
MASTROIANNI, Sergio 33, avenue des Esperelles, Apt. 203 F-13500 Martigues / FR | Representative(s) | Hawkins, David George, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Hawkins, David George, et al Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey, KT16 8LA / GB | ||
Former [2006/33] | Hawkins, David George, et al COMPASS PATENT LLP Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | ||
Former [2005/43] | Hawkins, David George, et al Innovene Europe Limited, European Patents Group, Compass Point, 79-87 Kingston Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03767953.7 | 03.12.2003 | [2005/43] | WO2003GB05207 | Priority number, date | EP20020358030 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: EP 02358030 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004055062 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1587844 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/64, C08F4/02 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
C08F10/02 (EP,US);
C08F4/64 (KR);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/02 (KR);
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/6592 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/02, C08F4/025 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65916 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRÄGERTER OLEFIN-POLYMERISATIONSKATALYSATOR | [2005/43] | English: | SUPPORTED OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION CATALYST | [2005/43] | French: | CATALYSEUR SUPPORTE DE POLYMERISATION D'OLEFINES | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 30.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9902570 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,14-18 * examples 3-5 *; | [X]EP0785220 (ENICHEM SPA [IT]) [X] 1-4,10,14-18 * examples 10-14; claims 11-13 *; | [X]US6107230 (MCDANIEL MAX P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-18 * examples 12,13 *; | [X]US6387839 (JIN MAOZHU [CN], et al) [X] 1,3,10,14-18 * examples 1,2 *; | [X]WO0244222 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11,14-18 * example 1 *; | [X]EP1097949 (JAPAN POLYCHEM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,10,11,14-18 * the whole document * |