EP1496565 - ANTENNA AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAE, Misako c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co. Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg.3-7,Shiromi1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
YUDA, Naoki 5-2-507, Kikugaokaminamimachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0092 / JP | 03 /
SATOH, Yuki 1-4-11-602, Uchiawajimachi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-0038 / JP | 04 /
INUZUKA, Tsutomu Matsushita Electric Ind. Co. Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2006/48] |
Former [2006/47] | 01 /
SAKAE, Misako c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co. Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg.3-7,Shiromi1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | ||
02 /
YUDA, Naoki 5-2-507, Kikugaokaminamimachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0092 / JP | |||
03 /
SATOH, Yuki 1-4-11-602, Uchiawajimachi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-0038 / JP | |||
04 /
INUZUKA, Tsutomu 1-31-6, Kuzuhamendori-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1113 / JP | |||
Former [2005/02] | 01 /
SAKAE, Misako 7-85, Ikagakitamachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0036 / JP | ||
02 /
YUDA, Naoki 5-2-507, Kikugaokaminamimachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0092 / JP | |||
03 /
SATOH, Yuki 1-4-11-602, Uchiawajimachi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-0038 / JP | |||
04 /
INUZUKA, Tsutomu 1-31-6, Kuzuhamendori-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1113 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03768135.0 | 22.12.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003JP16425 | Priority number, date | JP20030004449 | 10.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003004449 | [2005/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004064193 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496565 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/36, H01Q1/40, H01Q1/38, H01Q1/24, H01Q7/06 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
H01Q11/08 (EP,US);
H01Q1/1207 (EP,US);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/362 (EP,US);
H01Q5/378 (EP,US);
H01Q7/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | H01Q1/36, H01Q1/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/18] |
Former [2005/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANTENNE UND ELEKTRONISCHE EINRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2005/02] | English: | ANTENNA AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME | [2005/02] | French: | ANTENNE ET DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT CETTE ANTENNE | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2004 | Translation filed | 25.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0984510 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]EP1098387 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 9, line 25 - column 10, line 10 *; | [A]WO02055315 (HANEX CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2002118490 (HANEX CO LTD); | [A]JP2001196845 (CERA INC K); | [A]WO9948169 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) |