EP1627592 - CAPSULIZED MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2006/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIYAMA, Akio 16-34-D105, Osone 3-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0003 / JP | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/08] | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03768225.9 | 25.12.2003 | [2006/08] | WO2003JP16692 | Priority number, date | JP20030152956 | 29.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003152956 | [2006/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004105590 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1627592 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
A61B5/073 (EP,US);
A61B1/00016 (EP,US);
A61B1/0002 (EP,US);
A61B1/04 (EP,US);
A61B1/041 (EP,US);
A61B5/4839 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/36] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINGEKAPSELTE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2006/08] | English: | CAPSULIZED MEDICAL DEVICE | [2006/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEDICAL EN CAPSULE | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2005 | Translation filed | 16.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 25.05.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002103417 (GAZDZINSKI ROBERT F [US]) [X] 1-7,9-16,18,19,21-24 * paragraphs [0015] , [0038] , [0067] , [0070] , [0074] - [0076] *; | [X]GB2373330 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,3,11,12,21,23* page 8, line 17; claims 1-5 *; | [X]US2002198439 (MIZUNO HITOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6,11-15,21,23 * paragraph [0035]; claims 11-18 *; | [XA]US2003023150 (YOKOI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9,11-15,18,21,23 * paragraphs [0062] - [0078] - [0177] , [0186] , [0240] - [0250] - [0278]; claims 24,25 * [A] 24 | International search | [Y]JP2002159472 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JP2003038425 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JP2003135389 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) |