EP1575809 - SHOCK-ABSORBING OCCUPANT PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2005/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Björn Barkassavägen 7 S-439 35 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Glenn Skänningegatan 15 S-418 71 Göteborg / SE | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Ekström, Nils Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Ekström, Nils Albihns Göteborg AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03768452.9 | 15.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003SE01948 | Priority number, date | SE20020003800 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: SE 0203800 | [2005/38] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004056617 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1575809 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575809 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/04 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
B60R21/05 (EP,US);
B60N2/42736 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0407 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOSSDÄMPFENDER SCHUTZ FÜR INSASSEN | [2005/38] | English: | SHOCK-ABSORBING OCCUPANT PROTECTION | [2005/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF AMORTISSEUR DE SECURITE D'OCCUPANT | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 13.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 02.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.09.2007 | BE | 12.09.2007 | CH | 12.09.2007 | CY | 12.09.2007 | CZ | 12.09.2007 | DK | 12.09.2007 | EE | 12.09.2007 | FI | 12.09.2007 | LI | 12.09.2007 | NL | 12.09.2007 | RO | 12.09.2007 | SI | 12.09.2007 | SK | 12.09.2007 | TR | 12.09.2007 | BG | 12.12.2007 | GR | 13.12.2007 | LU | 15.12.2007 | IE | 17.12.2007 | ES | 23.12.2007 | IT | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | PT | 12.02.2008 | HU | 13.03.2008 | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/43] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CY | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
TR | 12.09.2007 | ||
BG | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
LU | 15.12.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
HU | 13.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CY | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BG | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
LU | 15.12.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CY | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
RO | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 12.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE836748 (FRANZ DERWAHL); | [X]US3370886 (DAHLE FROST JAMES); | [A]US3614129 (SOBKOW WILLIAM J); | [A]DE4441777 (SINGER HOLM [DE]); | [A]DE19647690 (LIGNOTOCK GMBH [DE]); | [X]US5967594 (RAMANUJAM NARAYANAN [US]) |