EP1565505 - PRESSURE SENSITIVE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leatech, LLC 4900A Meridian Way, 2 Frederick, MD 21703 / US | [2005/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMNER, Marvine, P. 4900A Meridian Way, 2 Frederick, MD 21703 / US | 02 /
MULLIGAN, Robert, F. 1298B Riverside Avenue Baltimore, MD 21230 / US | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03768723.3 | 07.11.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003US35401 | Priority number, date | US20020290739 | 08.11.2002 Original published format: US 290739 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004044865 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1565505 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/02, C08G61/12, C08G77/14 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
C08G18/3215 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/28 (KR);
B32B5/16 (KR);
C08G18/38 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/08 (KR);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
G01L1/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2261/94 (KR);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKEMPFINDLICHES MATERIAL | [2005/34] | English: | PRESSURE SENSITIVE MATERIAL | [2005/34] | French: | MATIERE SENSIBLE A LA PRESSION | [2005/34] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 29.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0053937 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 15 - page 6, line 5; claims 1-12 *; | [X]EP0468777 (PURITAN BENNETT CORP [US]) [X] 13* page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 39; example -; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US5498549 (NAGEL COLLEEN C [US], et al) [X] 13,21,23,24 * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 67 * * column 15, line 48 - column 19, line 35; examples 1-3; claims 1,13-31 *; | [A]EP0759451 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 19 - page 13, line 7; examples 41-7 *; | [A]JPH09104817 (HOKUSHIN IND) [A] 1; | [A]WO9747966 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 15 - page 6, line 33; example B1; claims 1-9 * | International search | [Y]US5359887 (SCHWAB SCOTT D [US], et al); | [Y]WO9212424 (UNIV IOWA STATE RES FOUND INC [US]) |