EP1539520 - SAFETY SYSTEM FOR LIQUID FUEL TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inergy Automotive Systems Research (SA) Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANACHAUD, Patrick Chemin Sainte-Hélène, 90 F-53000 Laval / FR | 02 /
COVET, Jacques 6, Rue du Maine F-53200 Gennes S/Glaize / FR | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Jacques, Philippe Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 03769276.1 | 12.09.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003EP10191 | Priority number, date | FR20020011466 | 13.09.2002 Original published format: FR 0211466 | [2005/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004024487 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539520 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539520 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/04 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
B60K15/04 (EP,US);
B60K2015/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSYSTEM FÜR FLÜSSIGBRENNSTOFFTANK | [2005/24] | English: | SAFETY SYSTEM FOR LIQUID FUEL TANK | [2005/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE SECURITE POUR RESERVOIR A CARBURANT LIQUIDE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 23.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2006 | CY | 29.11.2006 | CZ | 29.11.2006 | EE | 29.11.2006 | FI | 29.11.2006 | GB | 29.11.2006 | IE | 29.11.2006 | IT | 29.11.2006 | NL | 29.11.2006 | RO | 29.11.2006 | SI | 29.11.2006 | SK | 29.11.2006 | TR | 29.11.2006 | BG | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | SE | 28.02.2007 | GR | 01.03.2007 | ES | 12.03.2007 | PT | 30.04.2007 | HU | 30.05.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CY | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
EE | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
GB | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
EE | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
GB | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
GB | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
GB | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR952137 (FORD) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2548734 (EDWARD MATHEY ALCIDE) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2458418 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0026727 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]); | [DY]US5183087 (AUBEL JOHN A [US], et al) [DY] 1,2 * column A; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5740842 (MAIER JOSEF [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,10 * page 4, line 15 - line 17 * * column A; figures 1,7 *; | [Y]EP0921026 (SOLVAY [BE]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * |