EP1585648 - AUTOMOTIVE LIGHT AND METHOD FOR INDICATING DIFFERENT SIGNAL PATTERNS OF AN AUTOMOTIVE LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEFELEIN, Carsten Dianastrasse 58 85540 Haar / DE | [2005/42] | Application number, filing date | 03769491.6 | 03.11.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003EP12450 | Priority number, date | DE2003102460 | 23.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10302460 | [2005/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004065172 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1585648 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1585648 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/26, B60Q1/44, F21S8/10 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0052 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0058 (EP,US);
B60Q1/2607 (EP,US);
B60Q1/444 (EP,US);
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
F21Y2113/00 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/19] |
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLEUCHTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE UNTERSCHIEDLICHER SIGNALBILDER EINER FAHRZEUGLEUCHTE | [2005/42] | English: | AUTOMOTIVE LIGHT AND METHOD FOR INDICATING DIFFERENT SIGNAL PATTERNS OF AN AUTOMOTIVE LIGHT | [2005/42] | French: | PHARE DE VEHICULE ET PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE DE DIVERSES IMAGES DE SIGNAL D'UN PHARE DE VEHICULE | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1213531 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6,8,9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-3 *; | [YA]US6133852 (TONKIN MARK CHRISTOPHER [GB]) [Y] 1-4,6,8,9 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 59; figure 1 * [A] 10; | [A]US2002075148 (BOYER CLYDE H [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0942225 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028]; figures 3,6 * | by applicant | DE19624046 | DE19931712 | DE19820656 |