EP1567727 - MOUNTING OF OFFSHORE STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHC Engineering Business Limited Broomhaugh House Riding Mill Northumberland NE44 6EG / GB | [2010/29] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states IHC Engineering Bussiness Limited Broomhaugh House Riding Mill Northumberland NE44 6EG / GB | ||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states The Engineering Business Limited Broomhaugh House Riding Mill Northumberland NE44 6EG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATCHORN, Michael John The Old Coach House High Mickley Nr Stocksfield Northumberland NE43 7LU / GB | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Nigel Paul, et al HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Sanderson, Nigel Paul, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York Y01 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2005/35] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03769626.7 | 20.10.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003GB04529 | Priority number, date | GB20020024656 | 23.10.2002 Original published format: GB 0224656 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004038108 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1567727 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1567727 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E02D27/42, E02D27/52, E04H12/22, F03D1/00 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
E02D27/50 (EP,US);
E02B17/00 (EP,GB,US);
B63B27/08 (EP,US);
B63B35/003 (EP,US);
E02B17/027 (EP,US);
E02D27/42 (EP,US);
E02D27/425 (EP,US);
E04H12/2269 (EP,US);
F03D13/10 (EP,US);
F03D13/22 (EP,US);
E02B2017/0039 (EP,US);
E02B2017/0043 (EP,US);
E02B2017/0047 (EP,US);
E02B2017/0091 (EP,US);
E02D27/52 (EP,US);
F05B2230/6102 (EP,US);
F05B2240/95 (EP,US);
F05B2240/97 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG VON OFFSHORE-STRUKTUREN | [2005/35] | English: | MOUNTING OF OFFSHORE STRUCTURES | [2005/35] | French: | MONTAGE DE STRUCTURES EN ZONE AU LARGE DES COTES | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.06.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | 02.06.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.06.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.2010 | BE | 21.07.2010 | CY | 21.07.2010 | CZ | 21.07.2010 | EE | 21.07.2010 | FI | 21.07.2010 | IT | 21.07.2010 | RO | 21.07.2010 | SE | 21.07.2010 | SI | 21.07.2010 | SK | 21.07.2010 | TR | 21.07.2010 | LU | 20.10.2010 | BG | 21.10.2010 | GR | 22.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | ES | 01.11.2010 | PT | 22.11.2010 | HU | 22.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
LU | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
HU | 22.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
HU | 22.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 21.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE597543 (HEINRICH TOUSSAINT, et al); | [Y]CH241601 (DESMEULES FRERES [CH]); | [XY]CH363463 (ANDERSSON GUSTAV MATTIAS [SE]); | [A]US3716994 (POGONOWSKI I); | [Y]US4406094 (HEMPEL JOACHIM [DE], et al); | [A]US4720214 (BRASTED LEE K [US], et al); | [A]DE19607972 (STRAEB GMBH & CO GEB [DE]); | [A]US6425708 (SIEGFRIEDSEN SONKE [DE]) | by applicant | CH241601 | CH363463 | US4406091 |