EP1557486 - SINGLE CRYSTAL BASE THIN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | For all designated states International Superconductivity Technology Center, The Juridical Foundation 6th floor, Eishin Kaihatsu Building, 34-3, Shinbashi 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, Ltd 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
For all designated states International Superconductivity Technology Center, The Juridical Foundation 6th floor, Eishin Kaihatsu Building, 34-3, Shinbashi 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Katsuya, c/o Osaka Works Sumimoto Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3-1 Shimaya Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-8511 / JP | 02 /
IZUMI, Teruo, c/o Superconductivity Research Lab. 10-13, Shinonome 1-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 03 /
SHIOHARA, Yuh, c/o Superconductivity Research Lab. 10-13, Shinonome 1-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0062 / JP | 04 /
SUGAWARA, Yoshihiro, c/o Japan Fine Ceramics Ctr. 4-1, Mutsuno 2-chome, Atsuta-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 456-8587 / JP | 05 /
HIRAYAMA, Tsukasa, c/o Japan Fine Ceramics Center 4-1, Mutsuno 2-chome, Atsuta-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 456-8587 / JP | 06 /
OBA, Fumiyasu, Dpt Materials Science & Engineering Kyoto University Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 07 /
IKUHARA, Yuichi, c/o The University of Tokyo 2-11-16, Yayoi, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8656 / JP | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/30] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, Dipl.-Phys., et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03769995.6 | 29.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003JP13888 | Priority number, date | JP20020318523 | 31.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002318523 | [2005/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004040047 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1557486 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/22, H01L39/24 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
C30B23/02 (EP,US);
C30B29/22 (EP,KR,US);
H10N60/0604 (EP,US);
C30B25/18 (EP,US);
C30B29/225 (EP,US);
H10N60/01 (KR);
H10N60/0632 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/08] |
Former [2005/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINKRISTALLBASIS-DÜNNFILM | [2005/31] | English: | SINGLE CRYSTAL BASE THIN FILM | [2005/30] | French: | FILM MINCE A BASE CRISTALLINE UNIQUE | [2005/30] |
Former [2005/30] | EINKRISTALLBASIS-D NNFILM | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2005 | Translation filed | 25.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5635453 (PIQUE ALBERTO [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5607899 (YOSHIDA NORIYUKI [JP], et al); |