EP1593956 - DISEASE DIAGNOSING METHOD, METHOD FOR CREATING DATA FOR DISEASE DIAGNOSIS, AND DEVICE FOR CREATING DATA FOR DISEASE DIAGNOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K. K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K. K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kakui, Akimitsu c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
Honzawa, Katsu c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Yukiko c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03770030.9 | 30.10.2003 | [2005/45] | WO2003JP13935 | Priority number, date | JP20020320044 | 01.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002320044 | [2005/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004040273 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1593956 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N21/78, G01N33/48, G01N33/483 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N21/77 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6417 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7786 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/08] |
Former [2005/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRANKHEITSDIAGNOSEVERFAHREN, VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN VON DATENF R DIE KRANKHEITSDIAGNOSE UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON DATEN F R DIEKRANKHEITSDIAGNOSE | [2005/45] | English: | DISEASE DIAGNOSING METHOD, METHOD FOR CREATING DATA FOR DISEASE DIAGNOSIS, AND DEVICE FOR CREATING DATA FOR DISEASE DIAGNOSIS | [2005/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE DIAGNOSTIC D'UNE MALADIE, DISPOSITIF POUR GENERER DES DONNEES AFIN DE DIAGNOSTIQUER DES MALADIES ET DISPOSITIF POUR GENERER DES DONNEES AFIN DE DIAGNOSTIQUER DES MALADIES | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2005 | Translation filed | 06.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 29.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4559309 (EVENSON DONALD P [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * columns 4,5 *; | [XY]US5303026 (STROBL KARLHEINZ [US], et al) [X] 27-32 * figures 1,2 * * column 5 - column 8 * [Y] 1-26; | [A]US5532166 (MA YINFA [US]) [A] 1-26 * columns 4,5 *; | [A]EP1203944 (HOFSTETTER ALFONS PROF DR MED [DE], et al) [A] 1-32* the whole document * | International search | [X]WO0192859 (MEDICOMETRICS APS [DK], et al); | [Y]WO9735192 (NALCO CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [Y]WO0039565 (BAYER AG [US]); | [AE]JP2003065956 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JPS61100832 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH09159609 (JASCO CORP) |