EP1545694 - PROCESS FOR FORMING AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE LEAD CONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/26] | IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE LEAD CONDUCTOR AND PROCESS FOR FORMING | ||
[2008/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway, Northeast MS LC340 Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway, MSLC340 Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESSAR, Joseph, F. 3742 114th Lane Northwest Coon Rapids, MN 55432 / US | 02 /
MARTINEZ, Gonzalo 905 Nina Court Mendota Heights, MN 55118 / US | 03 /
BOSER, Gregory, A. 7313 Emerson Avenue South Richfield, MN 55423 / US | 04 /
WISER, Jeff, A. 11917 Crocus Street Coon Rapids, MN 55126 / US | 05 /
MCINTYRE, Peter, B. 2917 County Road H2 Mounds View, MN 55112 / US | 06 /
MAYER, David, W. 11108 Vessey Avenue South Bloomington, MN 55437 / US | 07 /
BAKER, Paul, D. 7018 44tj Street North Oakdale, MN 55128 / US | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03770472.3 | 25.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US30375 | Priority number, date | US20020261014 | 30.09.2002 Original published format: US 261014 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004030751 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1545694 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545694 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
A61N1/056 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL, SE [2006/03] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES IMPLANTIERBAREN MEDIZINISCHEN LEITERS | [2008/36] | English: | PROCESS FOR FORMING AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE LEAD CONDUCTOR | [2008/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UN CONDUCTEUR D'ELECTRODE DE DISPOSITIF MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE | [2008/36] |
Former [2005/26] | IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE ZULEITUNGSLEITER UND ENTSPRECHENDES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2005/26] | IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE LEAD CONDUCTOR AND PROCESS FOR FORMING | ||
Former [2005/26] | CONDUCTEUR D'ELECTRODE DE DISPOSITIF MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 17.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09000298.1 / EP2044972 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 16.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 25.02.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | CH | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | [2010/46] |
Former [2009/39] | NL | 25.02.2009 | |
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 25.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1070515 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,26,51 * page 4, column 5, line 10 - page 5, column 7, line 28; figure - *; | [A]EP1005879 (CARDIO PACING RESEARCH LAB KK [JP]) [A] 1,26,51 * page 2, column 2, line 7 - page 3, column 4, line 8; figure - *; | [A]US5330521 (COHEN DONALD M [US]) [A] 1,26,51 * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 26; figure - *; | [A]US6253111 (CARNER DAVID J [US]) [A] 1,26,51 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 32; figure - *; | [A]US5466252 (SOUKUP THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1,26,51 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 40; figure - *; | [A]US4711027 (HARRIS DONALD L [US]) [A] 1,26,51 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 54; figure - * | Examination | US5849031 |