EP1551504 - DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A METRIC FOR NON-SUSTAINED ARRHYTHMIC EVENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/28] | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A METRIC FOR NON-SUSTAINED ARRHYTHMIC EVENT | ||
[2010/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [2010/43] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. MS LC340, 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Xiaohong 10748 Hawthorn Trail Woodbury, MN 55124 / US | 02 /
OLSON, Walter, H. 16 Hay Camp Road North Oaks, MN 55127 / US | 03 /
GUNDERSON, Bruce, D. 4735 Pilgrim Lane North Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | 04 /
STADLER, Robert, W. 339 Oakwood Drive Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | [2006/46] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
ZHOU, Xiaohong 17715 45th Avenue North Plymouth, MN 55446 / US | ||
02 /
OLSON, Walter, H. 16 Hay Camp Road North Oaks, MN 55127 / US | |||
03 /
GUNDERSON, Bruce, D. 4735 Pilgrim Lane North Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | |||
04 /
STADLER, Robert, W. 339 Oakwood Drive Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03770599.3 | 30.09.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US31045 | Priority number, date | US20020261316 | 30.09.2002 Original published format: US 261316 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028632 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551504 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1551504 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39, A61B5/0452 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
A61B5/349 (EP,US);
A61N1/3956 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL, SE [2006/03] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR BESTIMMING EINER METRIK FÜR NICHTANHALTENDE ARRHYTHMIE | [2010/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A METRIC FOR NON-SUSTAINED ARRHYTHMIC EVENT | [2010/13] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER UNE METRIQUE DESTINEE A UN EVENEMENT ARYTHMIQUE NON PROLONGE | [2010/13] |
Former [2005/28] | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMING EINER METRIK FÜR NICHTANHALTENDE ARRHYTHMIE | ||
Former [2005/28] | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A METRIC FOR NON-SUSTAINED ARRHYTHMIC EVENT | ||
Former [2005/28] | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER UNE METRIQUE DESTINEE A UN EVENEMENT ARYTHMIQUE NON PROLONGE | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | [2011/24] | Cited in | Examination | US5277190 |